This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:19:29 (UTC).

GUTIERREZ v. THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 GUTIERREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Boasberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00587

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Boasberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUILLERMO GUTIERREZ

Defendants

MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, INC.

THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY

GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY

MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, INC. doing business as GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael E. Veve

Attorney at MICHAEL E. VEVE, PLLC

5029-A Backlick Road

Annandale, VA 22003

Defendant Attorneys

Raymond C. Baldwin

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW, LLP

975 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Christine M. Costantino

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW, LLP

975 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Veve, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond C. Baldwin on behalf of GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, INC. (Baldwin, Raymond) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Costantino, Christine) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, INC., THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

1 #3

Summons MFA

1 #2

Summons GWU

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT by GUILLERMO GUTIERREZ against GUILLERMO GUTIERREZ with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6869802) filed by GUILLERMO GUTIERREZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons GWU, #3 Summons MFA)(Veve, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Per Plaintiff's #5 Notice, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/9/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Veve, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/24/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond C. Baldwin on behalf of GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, INC. (Baldwin, Raymond) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' #3 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDERS that they shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by April 24, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/25/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY, MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Costantino, Christine) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, INC., THE GEORGE WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT by GUILLERMO GUTIERREZ against GUILLERMO GUTIERREZ with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6869802) filed by GUILLERMO GUTIERREZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons GWU, #3 Summons MFA)(Veve, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL FACULTY ASSOCIATES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEORGE WASHINGOTN UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Edward Veve