This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2022 at 08:45:49 (UTC).

Gutierrez v. Lincoln Property Management, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 Gutierrez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Lincoln Property Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jose E. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60977

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elena Gutierrez

Defendants

LINCOLN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC

WSE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC

FELIX HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jorge Freddy Perera

Attorney at Perera Aleman

12555 Orange Drive, Second Floor

Davie, FL 33330

Alexander Thomas Harne

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois

110 Se 6Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorney

Megan Laing Janes

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP

450 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Thomas Harne on behalf of Elena Gutierrez (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Summon(s)

4 #2

Summon(s)

4 #3

Summon(s)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Felix Hernandez, Lincoln Property Management, LLC, WSe Property Management. (mee) Modified text on 5/27/2022 (asl). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Court Practice IN FLSA Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (dj) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alexander T. Harne, Esq. for / by Elena Gutierrez. Responses due by 7/6/2022 (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#8

(#8) Statement of: Claim by Elena Gutierrez (Perera, Jorge) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW, granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Alexander Thomas Harne representing Gutierrez, Elena (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Defendant's RESPONSE to #8 Statement by WSe Property Management, LLC. (Janes, Megan) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Felix Hernandez, Lincoln Property Management, LLC, filed by Elena Gutierrez.(Perera, Jorge) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's RESPONSE to #8 Statement by WSe Property Management, LLC. (Janes, Megan) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant WSe Property Management, LLC shall have through and including July 20, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. No further extensions will be granted absent exigent circumstances. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/1/2022. (cvl) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by WSe Property Management, LLC. Attorney Megan Laing Janes added to party WSe Property Management, LLC (pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Janes, Megan) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW, granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Alexander Thomas Harne representing Gutierrez, Elena (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of: Claim by Elena Gutierrez (Perera, Jorge) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alexander T. Harne, Esq. for / by Elena Gutierrez. Responses due by 7/6/2022 (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Court Practice IN FLSA Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (dj) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Felix Hernandez, Lincoln Property Management, LLC, WSe Property Management. (mee) Modified text on 5/27/2022 (asl). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Elena Gutierrez (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s)) (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Thomas Harne on behalf of Elena Gutierrez (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-15660367, filed by Elena Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perera, Jorge) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY DBA TEXAS LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan Laing Janes