This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:40:43 (UTC).

Gutierrez v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Gutierrez filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Darrin P. Gayles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-20248

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Darrin P. Gayles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eduardo Gutierrez

Defendant

Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Francis Jessup

Attorney at Attorneys Dell & Schaefer, Chartered

2404 Hollywood Blvd.

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Matthew Fordin

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (pcs) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eduardo Gutierrez. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 1/31/2022, response/answer due 2/22/2022. (Jessup, Stephen) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Shutts & Bowen LLP, Other Affiliate Jonathan M. fordin, Other Affiliate The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eduardo Gutierrez (Jessup, Stephen) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#12

(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before April 1, 2022, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before April 1, 2022, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eduardo Gutierrez (Jessup, Stephen) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file its response on or before March 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Shutts & Bowen LLP, Other Affiliate Jonathan M. fordin, Other Affiliate The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Attorney Jonathan Matthew Fordin added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eduardo Gutierrez. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 1/31/2022, response/answer due 2/22/2022. (Jessup, Stephen) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy) (Entered: 01/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (pcs) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15335314, filed by Eduardo Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Jessup, Stephen) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Matthew Fordin