This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:57:31 (UTC).

Gutierrez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Gutierrez filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert H. Whaley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03067

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert H. Whaley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miguel Gutierrez

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D James Tree

Attorney at Tree Law Office

3711 Englewood Avenue

Yakima, WA 98902

Defendant Attorneys

David J Burdett

Attorney at Social Security Administration - OGC

701 5Th Avenue, Suite 2900, M/S 901

Seattle, WA 98104-7075

Timothy Michael Durkin

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office - SPO

920 W Riverside Suite 300, P O Box 1494

Spokane, WA 99210-1494

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION RE: SCHEDULING ORDER #9 - Plaintiff's dispositive motion to be filed by 8/14/2019. Defendant's dispositive motion to be filed by 9/25/2019. Response to dispositive motion due by 10/9/2019. Social Security Hearing set for 11/25/2019 in Without Oral Argument. Signed by Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION RE: SCHEDULING ORDER #9 - Plaintiff's dispositive motion to be filed by 8/14/2019. Defendant's dispositive motion to be filed by 9/25/2019. Response to dispositive motion due by 10/9/2019. Social Security Hearing set for 11/25/2019 in Without Oral Argument. Signed by Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Stipulated Scheduling Order by Miguel Gutierrez. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2019 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tree, D) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Administrative Record by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Burdett, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David J Burdett on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney David J Burdett added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Burdett, David) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miguel Gutierrez re Commissioner of Social Security. (Tree, D) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#4) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons - General Counsel, #2 Summons - US Atty General)(VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Miguel Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less