This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 10:01:54 (UTC).

Terisa Guthrie v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Terisa Guthrie filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and John D. Early. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01206

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terisa Guthrie

Defendants

FCA US LLC

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

Sullivan Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Does 1 through 10, inlcusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tionna Dolin

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1840 Century Park East Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J Gregg

Attorney at RoseWaldorf LLP

100 Oceangate Suite 300

Long Beach, CA 90802

Mark W Skanes

Attorney at RoseWaldorf LLP

100 Oceangate Suite 300

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #3 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #2 served on 7/15/2021. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings, LLC; FCA Holdco B.V; Stellantis N.V.. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Michael J. Gregg as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Docket(#14) ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT OF CASE by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice to the right, upon good cause being shown within 45 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. #13 Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Acceptance of Defendant's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 filed by Plaintiff Terisa Guthrie. (Dolin, Tionna) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Mark W. Skanes Re: Settlement and Joint Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#11) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 8/23/2021 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/16/2021. (lb) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Terisa Guthrie pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Sullivan Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Without Prejudice. Filed in State Court on 6/15/2021 Submitted with Attachment 9 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Sullivan Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. Filed in State Court on 6/7/2021 Submitted with Attachment 6 to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Michael J Gregg added to party Sullivan Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram (pty:dft), Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party Sullivan Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram (pty:dft))(car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Filed in State Court on 6/7/2021 Submitted with Attachment 5 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 7/16/2021 (car). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive FCA US LLC, Sullivan Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Terisa Guthrie. Filed in State Court on 4/20/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #3 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #2 served on 7/15/2021. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings, LLC; FCA Holdco B.V; Stellantis N.V.. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Michael J. Gregg as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark W Skanes counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Mark W. Skanes as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01196516 Receipt No: ACACDC-31633433 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Skanes, #2 Exhibit A - summons & complaint, #3 Exhibit B - service transmittal, #4 Exhibit C - other papers, #5 Exhibit D - state court answer, #6 Exhibit E - dealer's state court answer, #7 Exhibit F - MTC Arb, #8 Exhibit G - dealer's MTC Arb, #9 Exhibit H - RFD to dealer, #10 Exhibit I - 10K, #11 Exhibit J - sales) (Attorney Mark W Skanes added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Skanes, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Gregg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark W Skanes