This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:01:06 (UTC).

Guthrie v. District Court of Walker County Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Guthrie filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against District Court of Walker County Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Staci G Cornelius and Annemarie Carney Axon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Staci G Cornelius

Presiding Judge

Annemarie Carney Axon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Neil Guthrie

Jasper, AL 35501

Defendants

District Court of Walker County Alabama

Circuit Court of Walker County Alabama

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Doc. #2 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The plaintiff is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $6.63 in order to commence this action, and thereafter to make monthly installment payments toward payment of the full filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/3/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE re 1983 deficiencies by Daniel Neil Guthrie. (KEK) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER - To the extent the plaintiff requests appointment of counsel to assist him, the request is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The undersigned ORDERS the plaintiff to notify the court within fifteen (15) days whether he wishes to: (1) continue with this action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 and correct the deficiencies identified herein; or (2) dismiss this action and file a habeas petition. If the plaintiff fails to notify the court of his intentions within the allotted time, this action may be dismissed without further notice for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/21/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Neil Guthrie. (KEK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Circuit Court of Walker County Alabama, District Court of Walker County Alabama, filed by Daniel Neil Guthrie.(KEK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Doc. #2 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The plaintiff is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $6.63 in order to commence this action, and thereafter to make monthly installment payments toward payment of the full filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/3/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE re 1983 deficiencies by Daniel Neil Guthrie. (KEK) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER - To the extent the plaintiff requests appointment of counsel to assist him, the request is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The undersigned ORDERS the plaintiff to notify the court within fifteen (15) days whether he wishes to: (1) continue with this action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 and correct the deficiencies identified herein; or (2) dismiss this action and file a habeas petition. If the plaintiff fails to notify the court of his intentions within the allotted time, this action may be dismissed without further notice for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/21/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Neil Guthrie. (KEK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Circuit Court of Walker County Alabama, District Court of Walker County Alabama, filed by Daniel Neil Guthrie.(KEK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.