This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 09:04:32 (UTC).

Gutherless v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Gutherless filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00442

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katie Gutherless

Defendant

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jayson D. Nelson

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE LAW FIRM - NEBRASKA

6035 Binney Street

Omaha, NE 68104

Randal W. LeNeave

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE LAW FIRM - MINNESOTA

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Suite 101

Wayzata, MN 55391

Paul A. Banker

Attorney at HUNEGS, LENEAVE LAW FIRM - MINNESOTA

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Suite 101

Wayzata, MN 55391

Defendant Attorneys

Gina M. Rossi

Attorney at HALL, EVANS LAW FIRM - DENVER

1001 17Th Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Brian J. Urankar

Attorney at HALL, EVANS LAW FIRM - DENVER

1001 17Th Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Keith M. Goman

Attorney at HALL, EVANS LAW FIRM - DENVER

1001 17Th Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 9, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is August 3, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION as to Remote Deposition Procedures by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Katie Gutherless.(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#17

(#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Katie Gutherless.(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4296931 by Attorney Gina M. Rossi on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Rossi, Gina) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#14

(#14) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Gina M. Rossi has not registered for admittance to practice, or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JAB) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4292350 by Attorney Brian J. Urankar on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Urankar, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/14/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Goman, Keith) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Keith M. Goman on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Goman, Keith) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Keith M. Goman on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Goman, Keith) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 10/23/2020. (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 9, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is August 3, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TEXT ORDER approving #18 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION as to Remote Deposition Procedures by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Katie Gutherless.(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Plaintiff Katie Gutherless.(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney Gina M. Rossi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4296931 by Attorney Gina M. Rossi on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Rossi, Gina) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Gina M. Rossi has not registered for admittance to practice, or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JAB) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Brian J. Urankar. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4292350 by Attorney Brian J. Urankar on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Urankar, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A telephonic planning conference is set for December 4, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge to discuss case progression. The parties shall use the case conference instructions assigned to this case to participate in the call. (Filing No. #10 ). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/14/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Goman, Keith) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Keith M. Goman on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Goman, Keith) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Keith M. Goman on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Goman, Keith) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 10/23/2020. (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company, Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4262614), by Attorney Randal W. LeNeave on behalf of Katie Gutherless (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeNeave, Randal) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less