This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2019 at 07:45:01 (UTC).

Gurbir S Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 Gurbir S Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02199

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey

Paul R. Rodriguez

New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection

Defendants

Abc Corporations

Buckeye Fire Equipment Company

EI Dupont De Nemours & Company

The Chemours Company

National Foam Inc

3M Company

Kidde-Fenwal Inc

Chemguard Inc

Tyco Fire Products LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gwen Farley

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

25 Market Street, P.O. Box 093

Trenton, NJ 08625

Leonard Z. Kaufmann

Attorney at COHN, LIFLAND, PEARLMAN, HERRMANN & KNOPF, LLP

Justin J Arenas

Attorney at Law Offices of John K Dema PC

1236 Strand Street, Suite 103

Christiansted St Croix, VI 00823

Christina N Stripp

Attorney at Cohn Lifland Pearlman Herrmann and Knopf LLP

250 Pehle Avenue, Suite 401

Saddle Brook, NJ 07663

Scott E Kauff

Attorney at Law Offices of John K Dema PC

One Central Plaza, 11300 Rockville Pike, Suite 112

Rockville, MD 20852

Lana M Rowenko

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Joseph A Maurice

Attorney at Cohn Lifland Pearlman Herrmann and Knopf LLP

250 Pehle Avenue, Suite 401

Saddle Brook, NJ 07663

John K Dema

Attorney at Law Offices of John K Dema PC

1236 Strand Street, Suite 103

Christiansted St Croix, VI 00823

Daniel J Harrison

Attorney at New Jersey Attorney Generals Office

25 Market Street

Trenton, NJ 08625

David M Reap

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

John DS Gilmour

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Leonard Z Kaufmann

Attorney at Cohn Baughman and Martin

333 W Wacker Drive, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

William J Jackson

Attorney at Kelley Drye and Warren LLP

515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorneys

Ellen N Corbo

Attorney at Taylor Colicchio LLP

100 Canal Pointe Blvd, Suite 210

Princeton, NJ 08540

Ellen Nunno Corbo

Attorney at Burns White LLC

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 510

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

David R Erickson

Attorney at Shook Hardy and Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Keith Edward Smith

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

2700 Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Donald J. Camerson, II

Attorney at BRESSLER, AMERY & ROSS, ESQS.

325 Columbia Turnpike, Po Box 1980

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Nicole Gerritsen Mcdonough

Attorney at ARCHER & GREINER P.C.

21 Main Street, Court Plaza South - West Wing, Suite 353

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Thomas John Herten

Attorney at ARCHER & GREINER P.C.

21 Main Street, Suite 353

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#14

#16

#15

#13

#12

22 #1

Attachment A

22 #348

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • (#21) CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. An AMENDED COMPLAINT is to be filed in the member case only. When this document adds new defendant parties not currently listed as a party on the member case docket, the attorney filing user is to add each New Party, at the time of filing. ECF will prompt with "Please select the party that this filing is against"; the attorney filing user should choose to add each New Party and Select the Party at that time. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by David R Erickson on behalf of Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company LLC, The, EI DuPont De Nemours and Company, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI Dupont De Nemours & Company, The Chemours Company, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, E I E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Co., E I Du Point De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company LLC, Chemours Company FC LLC, The, EI Du Pont de Nemours & Co, EI DuPont de Nemours and Company, EI Du Pont de Nemours and Company, E I DU PONT DE NEMOURS (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Erickson, David) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#19) NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. Reply briefs are discouraged in the District of South Carolina, and any reply brief shall be submitted within seven (7) days of service of the responsive brief. Local Rule 7.07 D.S.C. Absent specific extenuating circumstances, the Court will not grant a motion, opposed or on consent, for an extension to file a reply brief. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Maurice on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(Maurice, Joseph) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by John K Dema on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez, Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(Dema, John) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina N Stripp on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez, Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(Stripp, Christina) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J Arenas on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez(Arenas, Justin) ***Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions. Clerk instructs attorney filing user to file correctly for all future filings.*** Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(sshe, ) Modified docket number on 9/10/2019 (sshe, ). (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Kauff on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez(Kauff, Scott) ***Refiled correctly in management case and spread to applicable member case(s), per Judge's filing instructions. Clerk instructs attorney filing user to file correctly for all future filings.*** Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG(sshe, ) Modified docket number on 9/10/2019 (sshe, ). (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J Arenas on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez (Arenas, Justin) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Kauff on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez (Kauff, Scott) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lana M Rowenko on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, Paul R. Rodriguez, NH, State of Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG, 2:19-cv-02285-RMG(Rowenko, Lana) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John DS Gilmour on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, Gurbir S. Grewal, Attorney General Of The State Of New Jersey, NH, State of Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG, 2:19-cv-02285-RMG(Gilmour, John) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by William J Jackson on behalf of New Jersey Department Of Environmental Protection, NH, State of Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:19-cv-02199-RMG, 2:19-cv-02285-RMG(Jackson, William) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#6) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New Jersey, 3:19-cv-14734, Gurbir S Grewal, Attorney General of the State of New Jersey et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:19-cv-2199-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 5 (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference set for 9/6/2019 9:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at # MDL-2873 (sshe, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-14734. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of South Carolina. (MDL 2873 CTO #14 Judge Richard M. Gergel) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by LEONARD Z. KAUFMANN on behalf of NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, GURBIR S. GREWAL, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, PAUL R. RODRIGUEZ (KAUFMANN, LEONARD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 07/09/2019. (jmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (jdb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MERCER COUNTY case number MER-L953-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9792255), filed by TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP, CHEMGUARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(HERTEN, THOMAS) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/7/2019.] (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION is a litigant

Latest cases where E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Buckeye Fire Equipment Company is a litigant