This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2020 at 08:22:16 (UTC).

Amit Gupta v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Amit Gupta filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09295

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amit Gupta

Defendants

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Silver Star A.G. Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larry Chae

Attorney at Veracis Law Corporation

333 City Boulevard West Suite 1700

Orange, CA 92868

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Elise Oaks

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Samantha Koopersmith

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Aaron Harris Jacoby

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

555 West Fifth Street 48Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1065

George N Koumbis

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

555 West Fifth Street 48Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1054

Gary Don Brophy

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

555 West Fifth Street, 48Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

15 #3

Declaration Declaration of service

15 #2

Proposed Order

15 #1

Declaration

#15

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D-Dealer Correspondence re Deal Jacket

1 #3

Exhibit C-MBUSA's Conformed Answer to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B-Summons & Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A-Deal Jacket

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2020
  • Docket(#23) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: This matter is currently set for a Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) scheduling conference on November 30, 2020. However, Plaintiff has filed a motion to remand the case back to state court, which is now set for December 10, 2020. Therefore, rather than having the parties make multiple appearances, the Court continues the November 30 scheduling conference to December 10, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#22) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 11/30/2020 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura County Superior Court #15 filed by Plaintiff Amit Gupta. (Chae, Larry) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Amit Gupta.. (Chae, Larry) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Silver Star A.G. Ltd., identifying Silver Star A.G., LTD dba Mercedes-Benz of Thousand Oaks. (Brophy, Gary) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Silver Star A.G. Ltd. answer now due 12/18/2020, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Silver Star A.G. Ltd..(Attorney Gary Don Brophy added to party Silver Star A.G. Ltd.(pty:dft))(Brophy, Gary) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura County Superior Court #15 filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ashley Oaks ISO MBUSA's Memo P&As ISO Opposition to Mx for Remand, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - 10-9-20 Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - 10-9-20 CF System Email, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - 10-17-20 Court's ECF Email, #5 MBUSA's Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Larry Chae)(Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #8 filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Koopersmith, Samantha) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Ventura County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Amit Gupta. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Declaration of service) (Chae, Larry) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amit Gupta, upon Defendant Silver Star A.G. Ltd. served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ron Keller, General Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chae, Larry) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Amit Gupta(Chae, Larry) (Entered: 10/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Filed in State Court on 10/9/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Amit Gupta. Filed in State Court on 8/26/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on October 9, 2020. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying AMIT GUPTA, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura Superior Court, case number 56-2020-00544715-CU-BC-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-28470435 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Deal Jacket, #2 Exhibit B-Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-MBUSA's Conformed Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-Dealer Correspondence re Deal Jacket) (Attorney Ashley Elise Oaks added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Oaks, Ashley) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Silver Star AG Ltd Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry Chae