This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2021 at 07:06:23 (UTC).

Gupta v. International Business Machines Corporation (IBM)

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Gupta filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against International Business Machines Corporation IBM. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04166

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vijay Gupta

Defendant

International Business Machines Corporation (IBM)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex R. Straus

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC

16748 Mccormick Street

Los Angeles, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#10

(#10) Case REASSIGNED to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to International Business Machines Corporation (IBM). (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

1 #16

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #15

Exhibit O - Swafford Leeke depo

1 #14

Exhibit N - Swafford Wirtenson Depo

1 #12

Exhibit L - Swafford Martinotti 30b6

1 #10

Exhibit J - Stephenson Clarke depo

1 #9

Exhibit I - Stephenson Blackwell

1 #7

Exhibit G - Batthany Email

1 #6

Exhibit F - Moorer Email

1 #5

Exhibit E - Choplin Dorsey Depo.

1 #4

Exhibit D - Choplin Maleki Depo.

1 #3

Exhibit C - Choplin Betthany Depo.

1 #2

Exhibit B - Choplin Martinotti Depo.

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against International Business Machines Corporation (IBM) ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16033060.). Filed byVijay Gupta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Beard v. IBM-Lipner, Maria Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Choplin Martinotti Depo., #3 Exhibit C - Choplin Betthany Depo., #4 Exhibit D - Choplin Maleki Depo., #5 Exhibit E - Choplin Dorsey Depo., #6 Exhibit F - Moorer Email, #7 Exhibit G - Batthany Email, #8 Exhibit H - Stephenson Martinotti 30b6, #9 Exhibit I - Stephenson Blackwell, #10 Exhibit J - Stephenson Clarke depo, #11 Exhibit K - Stephenson Moorer depo, #12 Exhibit L - Swafford Martinotti 30b6, #13 Exhibit M - Swafford depo briggs, #14 Exhibit N - Swafford Wirtenson Depo, #15 Exhibit O - Swafford Leeke depo, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case REASSIGNED to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docket(#9) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#7) 2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/16/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2021) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to International Business Machines Corporation (IBM). (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/24/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/16/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against International Business Machines Corporation (IBM) ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16033060.). Filed byVijay Gupta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Beard v. IBM-Lipner, Maria Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Choplin Martinotti Depo., #3 Exhibit C - Choplin Betthany Depo., #4 Exhibit D - Choplin Maleki Depo., #5 Exhibit E - Choplin Dorsey Depo., #6 Exhibit F - Moorer Email, #7 Exhibit G - Batthany Email, #8 Exhibit H - Stephenson Martinotti 30b6, #9 Exhibit I - Stephenson Blackwell, #10 Exhibit J - Stephenson Clarke depo, #11 Exhibit K - Stephenson Moorer depo, #12 Exhibit L - Swafford Martinotti 30b6, #13 Exhibit M - Swafford depo briggs, #14 Exhibit N - Swafford Wirtenson Depo, #15 Exhibit O - Swafford Leeke depo, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION is a litigant