This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 10:53:34 (UTC).

GUPTA et al v. Jaddou

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 GUPTA filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Jaddou. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00650

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANIL KUMAR GUPTA

POOJA GUPTA

RG

Defendant

Ur Jaddou

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Andrew Brown

Attorney at Reddy & Neumann, P.C.

11000 Richmond Avenue, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorney

J Kevin McClendon

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - Plano

101 E Park Blvd, Suite 500

Plano, TX 75074

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 9/12/2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/13/2022. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/13/2022. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#11

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #4 ) is set for hearing on Wednesday, October 12, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. at the Paul Brown United States Courthouse, 101 E. Pecan Street, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/20/2022. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #4 ) is set for hearing on Wednesday, October 12, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. at the Paul Brown United States Courthouse, 101 E. Pecan Street, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/20/2022. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ANIL KUMAR GUPTA, POOJA GUPTA, RG. (Brown, Steven) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/13/2022. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 9/12/2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/13/2022. (daj, ) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ur Jaddou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McClendon, J) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - Response To Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Ur Jaddou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClendon, J) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ur Jaddou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClendon, J) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Kevin McClendon on behalf of Ur Jaddou (McClendon, J) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2022
  • DocketCounsel are advised that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of filings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits, and please place very voluminous filings in three-ring binder(s). Staples are fine; no binder clips, please. (tls) (Entered: 08/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ANIL KUMAR GUPTA, POOJA GUPTA, RG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Later Filed Petitions, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANIL KUMAR GUPTA, RG, POOJA GUPTA. Ur Jaddou served on 8/8/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: To USAO)(Brown, Steven) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Ur Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(daj, ) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, ) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, ) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9041906.), filed by ANIL KUMAR GUPTA, RG, POOJA GUPTA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Steven) Modified on 7/28/2022 (daj, ). (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R.G. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Kevin McClendon