This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:25:21 (UTC).

Gunther v. St. Louis County Police Department

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Gunther filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against St Louis County Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David D. Noce and Rodney W. Sippel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01086

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David D. Noce

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rex Gunther

Farmington, MO 63640

Peter Kroner

Farmington, MO 63640

Defendant

St. Louis County Police Department

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Letter to Rex Gunther from Court re: improper service. Copy of letter mailed this date to Plaintiff via mail (ANP) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Letter from Rex Gunther re: pertinent information to this case (KEK) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE improper service: by Plaintiff Rex Gunther (ANP) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#5

(#5) Letter to Clerk of Court from Rex S. Gunther re: Receipt of documents. (ARL) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#4

(#4) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge David D. Noce to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (JMP) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Rex Gunther. (JMP) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant St. Louis County Police Department Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Rex Gunther. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BAK) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter to Rex Gunther from Court re: improper service. Copy of letter mailed this date to Plaintiff via mail (ANP) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Rex Gunther re: pertinent information to this case (KEK) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE improper service: by Plaintiff Rex Gunther (ANP) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter to Clerk of Court from Rex S. Gunther re: Receipt of documents. (ARL) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge David D. Noce to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (JMP) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Rex Gunther. (JMP) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketReceipt 4644088972 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Gunther, Rex (CCAM) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Aug 18 10:00:53 CDT 2020 (admin,) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant St. Louis County Police Department Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Rex Gunther. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BAK) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less