This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:36:09 (UTC).

Gunn v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Gunn filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are G. Kendall Sharp and Philip R. Lammens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00382

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G. Kendall Sharp

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heidi H. Gunn

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard A. Culbertson

Attorney at Law Office of Richard A. Culbertson

Suite E, 3200 Corrine Dr

Orlando, FL 32803

Sarah Patience Jacobs

Attorney at Law Office of Richard A. Culbertson

Suite E, 3200 Corrine Dr

Orlando, FL 32803

 

Court Documents

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/20/2020. (JWM) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/18/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF of service as to Office of Attorney General by Heidi H. Gunn. (RLK) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF of service as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel by Heidi H. Gunn. (RLK) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS returned executed by Heidi H. Gunn. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (RLK) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney Office)(RLK) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/20/2020. (JWM) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Heidi H. Gunn. Related case(s): No (Culbertson, Richard) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#6) ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway. (LAB) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 8/18/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-382-Oc-18PRL. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (SJB) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Patience Jacobs on behalf of Heidi H. Gunn (Jacobs, Sarah) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Heidi H. Gunn. (Culbertson, Richard) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Heidi H. Gunn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Appendix Marshals Forms)(Culbertson, Richard) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less