This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 11:38:45 (UTC).

Gunn et al v. FCA US, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Gunn filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02229

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Gunn

Dustin Stafford

Defendants

FCA US, LLC

Stellantis N.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David K. Stein

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 2100

Oakland, CA 94607

Kyla Jenny Gibboney

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 2100

Oakland, CA 94607

Rosemary M. Rivas

Attorney at Gibbs Law Group LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 2100

Oakland, CA 94607

Defendant Attorneys

Kacey Renee Riccomini

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Alexander M Carnevale

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Other Affiliate FCA North America holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Foreign Sales Holdco Ltd. (UK), Other Affiliate SFS UK1 Limited (UK) for FCA US, LLC. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Carnevale, Alexander) (Filed on 6/3/2022) Modified on 6/6/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

19 #1

Proposed Order

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M Carnevale (Carnevale, Alexander) (Filed on 6/2/2022) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#16

(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/3/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

15 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

15 #15

Main Document

#13

(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US, LLC.. (Riccomini, Kacey) (Filed on 5/2/2022) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Gunn.. (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Dustin Stafford (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by James Gunn (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to FCA US, LLC, Stellantis N.V. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Stein, David) (Filed on 4/8/2022) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Declaration of Kyla Gibboney

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Other Affiliate FCA North America holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Foreign Sales Holdco Ltd. (UK), Other Affiliate SFS UK1 Limited (UK) for FCA US, LLC. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Carnevale, Alexander) (Filed on 6/3/2022) Modified on 6/6/2022 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by FCA US, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/17/2022. Replies due by 6/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carnevale, Alexander) (Filed on 6/3/2022) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M Carnevale (Carnevale, Alexander) (Filed on 6/2/2022) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/3/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 05/02/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by FCA US, LLC.. (Riccomini, Kacey) (Filed on 5/2/2022) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/16/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation for Extension of Time for FCA US LLC to File Responsive Pleading Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by FCA US, LLC. (Riccomini, Kacey) (Filed on 4/29/2022) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Gunn, Dustin Stafford. FCA US, LLC served on 4/13/2022, answer due 5/4/2022. (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dustin Stafford.. (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Gunn.. (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Dustin Stafford (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by James Gunn (Gibboney, Kyla) (Filed on 4/20/2022) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to FCA US, LLC, Stellantis N.V. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Stein, David) (Filed on 4/8/2022) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FCA US, LLC, Stellantis N.V. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17072731.). Filed byJames Gunn, Dustin Stafford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kyla Gibboney, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stein, David) (Filed on 4/8/2022) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kacey Renee Riccomini