This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2019 at 07:44:19 (UTC).

Gulfstream Areospace Corporation v. Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Gulfstream Areospace Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher L. Ray and R. Stan Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00156

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

Presiding Judge

R. Stan Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gulfstream Areospace Corporation

Defendant

Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn A. Kachmar

Attorney at HunterMaclean, PC

P.O. Box 9848

Savannah, GA 31412-0048

Defendant Attorney

Theresa Davis Beaton

Attorney at Roberts Tate, LLC

2487 Demere Rd, Suite 400, P O Box 21828

Saint Simons Island, GA 31522

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc.. Responses due by 9/13/2019. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Davis Beaton on behalf of Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Rule 26 Instructions, Judge Ray Standard Procedures, GAC Disclosures and Summons served on Jackie Flood, Ellsworth Adhesives on 8.12.2019, filed by Gulfstream Areospace Corporation. (Kachmar, Shawn) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc. (evk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Gulfstream Areospace Corporation. (evk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#2

(#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 07/02/2019. (evk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Gulfstream Areospace Corporation against Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(evk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #2 Amended Civil Cover Sheet) (evk). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc.. Responses due by 9/13/2019. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Davis Beaton on behalf of Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc. (Beaton, Theresa) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc. answer due 9/2/2019. (jlh) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Rule 26 Instructions, Judge Ray Standard Procedures, GAC Disclosures and Summons served on Jackie Flood, Ellsworth Adhesives on 8.12.2019, filed by Gulfstream Areospace Corporation. (Kachmar, Shawn) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc. (evk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Gulfstream Areospace Corporation. (evk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • (#3) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 07/02/2019. (evk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2634016. (evk) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Gulfstream Areospace Corporation against Ellsworth Adhesives Specialty Chemical Distribution, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(evk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #2 Amended Civil Cover Sheet) (evk). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULFSTREAM AEROSPACE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn A. Kachmar