This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2021 at 08:22:18 (UTC).

Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC v. Fortis SBJV LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Gulf Coast Supply Manufacturing LLC filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Fortis SBJV LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J Michelle Childs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00330

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Michelle Childs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Your Roofers LLC

Federal Insurance Company

Western Surety Company

Michelle Hopper

Fortis SBJV LLC

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant

Fortis SBJV LLC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Your Roofers LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Jared Hudson Garraux

Attorney at Richardson Plowden and Robinson (Cola)

Po Drawer 7788

Columbia, SC 29202

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Bryan Patrick Kelley

Attorney at Elmore Goldsmith Kelley and deHoll PA

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1050

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

20 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Your Roofers LLC

#20

19 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Michelle Hopper

#19

#18

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E - Statement of Account

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice

1 #3

Exhibit C - Gulf Coast Invoices

1 #2

Exhibit B - Sale Agreement - REDACTED

1 #1

Exhibit A - Payment Bond

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Pro Se ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Your Roofers LLC.(asni, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Fortis SBJV LLC.(Kelley, Bryan) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Your Roofers LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC by Fortis SBJV LLC.(Kelley, Bryan) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Patrick Kelley on behalf of Fortis SBJV LLC (Kelley, Bryan) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC. Your Roofers LLC served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Your Roofers LLC)(Garraux, Jared) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC. Michelle Hopper served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service - Michelle Hopper)(Garraux, Jared) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY by Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC Notice of Availability for Trial. (Garraux, Jared) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC. Fortis SBJV LLC served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service - Fortis SBJV, LLC)(Garraux, Jared) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 8/25/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/5/2021. (asni, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/25/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/8/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 4/8/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/19/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/18/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/19/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/19/2021, Discovery due by 8/18/2021, Motions due by 9/1/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/1/2021, Bench Trial Deadline 11/1/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/5/2021. (asni, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Patrick Kelley on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, Western Surety Company (Kelley, Bryan) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC. Federal Insurance Company served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service - Federal Insurance Company)(Garraux, Jared) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC. Western Surety Company served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acceptance of Service - Western Surety Company)(Garraux, Jared) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC.(asni, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Michelle Hopper. (asni, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Your Roofers LLC. (asni, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (asni, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Western Surety Company. (asni, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Fortis SBJV LLC. (asni, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9627562.), filed by Gulf Coast Supply & Manufacturing LLC. Service due by 5/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit B - Sale Agreement - REDACTED, #3 Exhibit C - Gulf Coast Invoices, #4 Exhibit D - Notice, #5 Exhibit E - Statement of Account)(asni, ) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fortis SBJV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GULF COAST SUPPLY & MANUFACTURING LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant