This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 07:40:30

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Guitierrez-Huerta against Mary Lanning Hospital in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 8:19-CV-00321
  • Filing Date 07/22/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Civil Right
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Pro Se Docket
  • Courthouse Nebraska District

Party Details

  • Defendant Magee
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Kyle Woodworth
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Det. Dana Dramse
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Hastings Police Dept.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Adams County Jail Administrator
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Children's Hospital
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Sgt. Paul Weber
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Lt. Chad Hunt
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-Huerta
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant Dr. Suzanne Haney
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to ...

Free with Subscription
#7

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#3

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#12

(#12) LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-Huer...

Fees Apply
#10

(#10) MOTION to Extend on behalf of Plaintiff Angel O. Guiti...

Fees Apply
#8

(#8) SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-H...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account st...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint file...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • (#12) LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-Huerta. No check was received with this letter.(TCL) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
  • 09/03/2019
  • TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Angel O. Guitierrez-Huerta on 09/03/2019. Receipt number 8053180, in the amount of $25.00. (KLF) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Filing No. #10 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall have until October 9, 2019, to pay his initial partial filing fee of $3.84. The clerk's office is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: October 9, 2019: initial partial filing fee due.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
  • 08/22/2019
  • (#10) MOTION to Extend on behalf of Plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-Huerta. (LKO) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
  • 08/09/2019
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $3.84 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 9, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party & plaintiff's institution/emailed to finance)(LKO) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
  • 08/08/2019
  • (#8) SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-Huerta. (LKO) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#7) PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-Huerta. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#6) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Buffalo County Jail. (LKO) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#5) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-Huerta. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-Huerta. (LKO) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Adams County Jail Administrator, Children's Hospital, Dana Dramse, Benjamin Fage, Byron Gates, Suzanne Haney, Hastings Police Dept., Chad Hunt, Daniel Leonard, Magee, Mary Lanning Hospital, Neil Miller, Paul Weber, and Kyle Woodworth filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Angel O. Guitierrez-Huerta. (LKO) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.