This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:23:12 (UTC).

Guinnane et al v. Dobbins et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Guinnane filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dobbins. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald W. Molloy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald W. Molloy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Katherine Guinnane

Guinnane Ranch, LLC

Defendants

Nancy Dobbins

John Does 1-5

EAN Holdings, LLC

Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC

Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC doing business as Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Devlan Geddes

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Hallie E. Bishop

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Trent M. Gardner

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick M. Sullivan

Attorney at POORE ROTH & ROBINSON

1341 Harrison Ave

Butte, MT 59701-4898

Randall J. Colbert

Attorney at GARLINGTON LOHN & ROBINSON, PLLP

350 Ryman Street, Po Box 7909

Missoula, MT 59807-7909

J. Douglas Baldridge

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

600 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Theodore B. Randles

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

600 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#22

21 #1

Logerstedt v. Fourth Judicial District

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#13

3 #3

#4 - Summons Issued - Enterprise RAC

3 #2

#3 - Summons Issued - EAN Holdings LLC

3 #1

#2 - Summons Issued - Dobbins

#3

#2

1 #4

civil cover sheet

1 #2

Ex B - Acknowledgment and Waiver EAN

1 #1

Ex A - Complaint

#1

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Defendant Nancy Dobbins' Response To Ean Holdings And Enterprise Rac Company Of Montana/Wyomings Motion To Dismiss filed by Nancy Dobbins. (Sullivan, Patrick) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Katherine Guinnane, Guinnane Ranch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Logerstedt v. Fourth Judicial District) (Geddes, James) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC. (Baldridge, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) J. Douglas Baldridge appearing for Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC (Baldridge, J.) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Nancy Dobbins. (Sullivan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER denying #13 Motion to Dismiss as MOOT. Defendants may file a renewed motion or Answer on or before June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/7/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nancy Dobbins, EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC, John Does 1-5, filed by Guinnane Ranch, LLC, Katherine Guinnane. (Geddes, James) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Katherine Guinnane, Guinnane Ranch, LLC (Geddes, James) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC. (Colbert, Randall) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Randall J. Colbert appearing for Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC (Colbert, Randall) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Theodore B. Randles. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/16/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Douglas Baldridge. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/16/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION Theodore B. Randles to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2309416.) Randall J. Colbert appearing for Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Theodore B. Randles, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Randles) (Colbert, Randall) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION J. Douglas Baldridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2309400.) Randall J. Colbert appearing for Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit J. Douglas Baldridge, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Baldridge) (Colbert, Randall) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Nancy Dobbins. (NOS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Nancy Dobbins, EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC, John Does 1-5, filed by Guinnane Ranch, LLC, Katherine Guinnane. (NOS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE (via email from Missoula County). (Attachments: #1 2 - Summons Issued - Dobbins, #2 3 - Summons Issued - EAN Holdings LLC, #3 4 - Summons Issued - Enterprise RAC, #4 5 - Summons Served - Dobbins, #5 6 - Waiver of Service - Guinnane Ranch, #6 8 - Waiver of Service - EAN Holdings, #7 9- Waiver of Service - Enterprise RAC, #8 10 - Notice of Filing Removal, #9 11 - Notice of Removal) (NOS) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC. (Colbert, Randall) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2307453. (ASG) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Company of Montana/Wyoming, LLC from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-18-979. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Complaint, #2 Ex B - Acknowledgment and Waiver EAN, #3 Ex C - Acknowledgment and Waiver Enterprise, #4 civil cover sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trent M. Gardner