This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/15/2022 at 02:48:05 (UTC).

Guinn v. WAL-MART STORES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Guinn filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00099

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kim Guinn

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Gillespie

4925 Greenville Ave., Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75206

Joseph Halcut Gillespie

Attorney at Gillespie Sanford LLP - Dallas

4803 Gaston Ave

Dallas, TX 75246

Colin Walsh

Attorney at Wiley Walsh, P.C.

1011 San Jacinto Blvd., Suite 401

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan E. Griffitts

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201-2931

Charles H. Wilson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Scott A. Forman

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

333 S.E. 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Charles Howard Wilson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C. - Houston

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) FINAL JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All motions by any party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED-AS-MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/24/2021. (slo, ) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#58

(#58) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that all claims in the above-captioned cause of action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/24/2021. (slo, ) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#57

(#57) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal) by Kim Guinn. (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#56

(#56) ORDER Denying #36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by WAL-MART STORES, INC. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/24/2021. (slo, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#55

(#55) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Mediation (Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#54

(#54) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/2/2020. (slo, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#53

(#53) Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. . (Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#52

(#52) NOTICE by Kim Guinn (Joint Notice Regarding Mediation) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#36

#6

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) FINAL JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned cause is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All motions by any party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED-AS-MOOT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/24/2021. (slo, ) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that all claims in the above-captioned cause of action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/24/2021. (slo, ) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal) by Kim Guinn. (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER Denying #36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by WAL-MART STORES, INC. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/24/2021. (slo, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Mediation (Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/2/2020. (slo, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. . (Wilson, Charles) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE by Kim Guinn (Joint Notice Regarding Mediation) (Gillespie, Joseph) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing re #36 Motion to Dismiss held on 8/5/2020. (Court Reporter Kate McAlpine) (bas) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/31/20. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Guinn, Coleen Shin, Teresa Barber, Charlotte Hunter, Lisa Pardo, Angeline Vasquez Wright, Debbie Alonzo, Maria Moya, Teresa Cangiono, Thelma Pate, Diane Miller Fawcett. All Defendants. (Gillespie, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Merit Bennett for Debbie Alonzo,Merit Bennett for Teresa Barber,Merit Bennett for Teresa Cangiono,Merit Bennett for Diane Miller Fawcett,Merit Bennett for Kim Guinn,Merit Bennett for Charlotte Hunter,Merit Bennett for Maria Moya,Merit Bennett for Lisa Pardo,Merit Bennett for Thelma Pate,Merit Bennett for Coleen Shin,Merit Bennett for Angeline Vasquez Wright. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Colin Walsh by Debbie Alonzo, Teresa Barber, Teresa Cangiono, Diane Miller Fawcett, Kim Guinn, Charlotte Hunter, Maria Moya, Lisa Pardo, Thelma Pate, Coleen Shin, Angeline Vasquez Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gillespie, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Gillespie (on behalf of Merit Bennett) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13049356) by on behalf of Debbie Alonzo, Teresa Barber, Teresa Cangiono, Diane Miller Fawcett, Kim Guinn, Charlotte Hunter, Maria Moya, Lisa Pardo, Thelma Pate, Coleen Shin, Angeline Vasquez Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gillespie, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to WAL-MART STORES, INC. (jg1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Debbie Alonzo, Teresa Barber, Teresa Cangiono, Diane Miller Fawcett, Kim Guinn, Charlotte Hunter, Maria Moya, Lisa Pardo, Thelma Pate, Coleen Shin, Angeline Vasquez Wright. (Gillespie, Joseph) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge B (jg1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13011093). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Kim Guinn, Coleen Shin, Teresa Barber, Charlotte Hunter, Lisa Pardo, Debbie Alonzo, Maria Moya, Teresa Cangiono, Thelma Pate, Diane Miller Fawcett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walsh, Colin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 6/8/2020.] (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Howard Wilson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Griffitts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Alan Forman