This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2021 at 07:08:23 (UTC).

Guillotte v. Lafourche Parish et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Guillotte filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Lafourche Parish. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01400

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Joseph Guillotte

Thibodaux, LA 70301

Defendants

Lafourche Parish

Lafourche Parish Medical Department

Johnson & Johnson

Center for Disease Control & Prevention

Federal Emergency Management Agency

Unidentified Parties

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that #13 Motion for Extension and #14 Motion to get Information on Whether a Case was Filed are GRANTED in part for purposes of providing him with information about his cases and DENIED in part to the extent he seeks an extension of time to correct his deficiency in Civ. Action 21-1422F(5), a case that is not before this section of the Court as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/15/2021. (jeg) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER DENYING #10 Motion to Add Grievances to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/15/2021. (jeg) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE to the Court by Brian Joseph Guillotte. (ss) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Time Extension by Brian Joseph Guillotte. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (ss) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Federal Emergency Management Agency served on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (cg) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

11 #3

Summons

11 #2

Summons

11 #1

Summons

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Center for Disease Control & Prevention, Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jeg)(CC: USM with copy of IFP and Complaint) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#10

(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Add Grievances to Complaint by Brian Joseph Guillotte. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sdp) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

9 #4

Summons

9 #3

Summons

9 #2

Summons

9 #1

Summons

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Center for Disease Control & Prevention, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Johnson & Johnson, Lafourche Parish, Lafourche Parish Medical Department. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(jeg) (cc with copy of IFP and Complaint: USM) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (jeg). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#8

(#8) PAUPER ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's #4 MOTION for Extension of Time is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $3.62 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Brian Joseph Guillotte in monthly payments as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/16/2021.(jeg)(cc: Financial Unit and Warden) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#7

(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Joseph Guillotte. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Filing)(js) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document by Brian Joseph Guillotte. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (cg) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that #13 Motion for Extension and #14 Motion to get Information on Whether a Case was Filed are GRANTED in part for purposes of providing him with information about his cases and DENIED in part to the extent he seeks an extension of time to correct his deficiency in Civ. Action 21-1422F(5), a case that is not before this section of the Court as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/15/2021. (jeg) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER DENYING #10 Motion to Add Grievances to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/15/2021. (jeg) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE to the Court by Brian Joseph Guillotte. (ss) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Time Extension by Brian Joseph Guillotte. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (ss) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Federal Emergency Management Agency served on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (cg) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Center for Disease Control & Prevention, Federal Emergency Management Agency. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jeg)(CC: USM with copy of IFP and Complaint) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Add Grievances to Complaint by Brian Joseph Guillotte. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sdp) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Center for Disease Control & Prevention, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Johnson & Johnson, Lafourche Parish, Lafourche Parish Medical Department. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(jeg) (cc with copy of IFP and Complaint: USM) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (jeg). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAUPER ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's #4 MOTION for Extension of Time is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $3.62 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Brian Joseph Guillotte in monthly payments as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/16/2021.(jeg)(cc: Financial Unit and Warden) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Joseph Guillotte. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Filing)(js) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Brian Joseph Guillotte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Response/Reply by Brian Joseph Guillotte to #3 Notice of Deficient Filing (cg) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document by Brian Joseph Guillotte. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (cg) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/16/2021. (eb) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/16/2021) (bwn). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brian Joseph Guillotte. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (eb) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ***DEFICIENT*** COMPLAINT against Center for Disease Control & Prevention, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Johnson & Johnson, Lafourche Parish, Lafourche Parish Medical Department, Unidentified Parties filed by Brian Joseph Guillotte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eb) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Emergency Management Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant