This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:20:33 (UTC).

Guidry et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Guidry filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01972

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bernadine Guidry

Cleveland Guidry

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Joseph Sipos, Jr

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan (BPK)

30338 Overseas Hwy Ste Unit 7

Big Pine Key, FL 33043

Defendant Attorneys

Michele Trowbridge Barreca

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (NO)

704 Carondelet St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Charles L Chassaignac, IV

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (BR)

301 St Charles St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Eleanor Weeks Wall

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (BR)

301 St Charles St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Emily S Morrison

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (BR)

704 Carondelet St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Matthew Edward Simmons

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (NO)

704 Carondelet St

New Orleans, LA 70130

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

8 #1

State court notice of filing

#8

(#8) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co . (Attachments: #1 State court notice of filing)(aty,Barreca, Michele) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#7

(#7) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/16/2021. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Barreca, Michele) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Barreca, Michele) Modified docket text on 7/13/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/9/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Michele Trowbridge Barreca on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/23/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

1 #3

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Farm Summary of Loss

1 #1

Exhibit A - Petition, etc.

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 31st JDC Jefferson Davis Parish, Case Number C-306-21 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4732409) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, etc., #2 Exhibit B - State Farm Summary of Loss, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Michele Trowbridge Barreca added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Barreca, Michele) Modified docket text on 7/9/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/09/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co . (Attachments: #1 State court notice of filing)(aty,Barreca, Michele) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/16/2021. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Barreca, Michele) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Barreca, Michele) Modified docket text on 7/13/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/9/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Michele Trowbridge Barreca on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/23/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 7/16/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 31st JDC Jefferson Davis Parish, Case Number C-306-21 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4732409) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, etc., #2 Exhibit B - State Farm Summary of Loss, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Michele Trowbridge Barreca added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Barreca, Michele) Modified docket text on 7/9/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michele Trowbridge Barreca(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eleanor Weeks Wall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles L. Chassaignac, IV