This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 08:24:36 (UTC).

Guglielmo v. The Level Group USA Corp.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Guglielmo filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Level Group USA Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05920

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Guglielmo

Defendant

The Level Group USA Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Paul Force

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

285 Passaic Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Level Group USA Corp. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren. Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo..(Force, David) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at October 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time, as further set forth. (Telephone Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/26/2020) (mml) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Level Group USA Corp...(pne) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Level Group USA Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo..(Force, David) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Force, David) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Level Group USA Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20921590)Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo..(Force, David) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Level Group USA Corp. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren. Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo..(Force, David) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at October 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time, as further set forth. (Telephone Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/26/2020) (mml) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Level Group USA Corp...(pne) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Level Group USA Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo..(Force, David) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Force, David) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Level Group USA Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20921590)Document filed by Joseph Guglielmo..(Force, David) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less