This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 07:58:35 (UTC).

Guerrero v. My Cube, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Guerrero filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against My Cube, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00270

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edelmira Guerrero

Defendant

My Cube, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph H Mizrahi

Attorney at Mizrahi & Kroub LLP

200 Vesey St, 24Th Floor

New York, NY 11201

Edward Y. Kroub

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Jarrett Scott Charo

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street, Ste 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

William Downes

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street, Ste 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

Defendant Attorney

William Thymius

Attorney at Law Office of Christopher P. Di Giulio, P.C.

111 John Street, Suite 1615

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#1

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to My Cube, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edelmira Guerrero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to My Cube, LLC. (vf) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#6

(#6) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#7

(#7) FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Plaintiff, JGK Guerrero.Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of JGK Guerrero on April 6, 2022 at 10 a.m..Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#9

(#9) REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS.Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Y. Kroub on behalf of Edelmira Guerrero..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Downes on behalf of Edelmira Guerrero..(Downes, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jarrett Scott Charo on behalf of Edelmira Guerrero..(Charo, Jarrett) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER: The parties are directed to file a Rule 26(f) report by February 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/28/2022) (jca) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#14

(#14) RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Edelmira Guerrero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#15

(#15) RULE 26(f) REPORT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: At this time, there are no other orders that the Court should issue under Rule 26(c) or Rule 16(b) and (c). Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2022. Motions due by 8/19/2022. Responses due by 8/12/2022 Replies due by 9/13/2022. Fact Discovery due by 6/13/2022. Expert Discovery due by 7/28/2022. Pretrial Order due by 9/2/2022. Dispositive motions due by 8/19/22. Joint Pre-Trial order due 9/2/22, or 14 days after decision of any dispositive motion. Ready-Trial, 48 hours notice, 14 days after submissions of Joint Pre-Trial order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/10/2022) (ks) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#16

(#16) RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULE 26(f) REPORT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: At this time, there are no other orders that the Court should issue under Rule 26(c) or Rule 16(b) and (c). Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2022. Motions due by 8/19/2022. Responses due by 8/12/2022 Replies due by 9/13/2022. Fact Discovery due by 6/13/2022. Expert Discovery due by 7/28/2022. Pretrial Order due by 9/2/2022. Dispositive motions due by 8/19/22. Joint Pre-Trial order due 9/2/22, or 14 days after decision of any dispositive motion. Ready-Trial, 48 hours notice, 14 days after submissions of Joint Pre-Trial order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/10/2022) (ks) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Edelmira Guerrero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The parties are directed to file a Rule 26(f) report by February 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/28/2022) (jca) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jarrett Scott Charo on behalf of Edelmira Guerrero..(Charo, Jarrett) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Downes on behalf of Edelmira Guerrero..(Downes, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Y. Kroub on behalf of Edelmira Guerrero..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS.Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of JGK Guerrero on April 6, 2022 at 10 a.m..Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Plaintiff, JGK Guerrero.Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by My Cube, LLC..(Thymius, William) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to My Cube, LLC. (vf) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph H Mizrahi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (vf) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to My Cube, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Edelmira Guerrero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against My Cube, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25571558)Document filed by Edelmira Guerrero..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less