This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2022 at 18:54:32 (UTC).

Guerrero v. Golden State FC LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Guerrero filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Golden State FC LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alex G. Tse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01161

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alex G. Tse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Guerrero

Defendants

Amazon.com Services LLC

Amazon.com, Inc.

Golden State FC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel L. Feder

Attorney at The Law Offices of Daniel L. Feder

235 Montgomery Street, Suite 1019

San Francisco, CA 94104

Eric Lechtzin

Attorney at Edelson Lechtzin LLP

411 S. State Street, Suite N-300

Newtown, PA 18940

Defendant Attorneys

Helen Ofelia Avunjian

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Jordan E Johnson

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Megan M. Cooney

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612-4412

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Declaration of Megan Cooney in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal

1 #2

Declaration of Denicia "JP" Prather in Support of Defendants' Not

1 #3

Declaration of Zane Brown in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Certificate/Proof of Service

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC (now known as Amazon.com Services LLC) (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC (now known as Amazon.com Services LLC) of Pendency of Related Actions (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/20/202 2. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Move to Remand filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC and Jennifer Guerrero. (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 3/2/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC.. (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal of Class Action with the Superior Court by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 3/14/2022) Modified on 3/15/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Action Pending Resolution of Trevino v. Golden State FC LLC, Lead Case No. 1:18-CV-00120-DAD-BAM (E.D. CAL.) filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC and Jennifer Guerrero. (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 3/31/2022) Modified on 4/1/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER Staying Action Pending Resolution of Trevino v. Golden State FC LLC signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #10 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER Staying Action Pending Resolution of Trevino v. Golden State FC LLC signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #10 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Action Pending Resolution of Trevino v. Golden State FC LLC, Lead Case No. 1:18-CV-00120-DAD-BAM (E.D. CAL.) filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC and Jennifer Guerrero. (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 3/31/2022) Modified on 4/1/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal of Class Action with the Superior Court by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 3/14/2022) Modified on 3/15/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC.. (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 3/10/2022) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Move to Remand filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC and Jennifer Guerrero. (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 3/2/2022) Modified on 3/2/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/20/202 2. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/11/2022. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC (now known as Amazon.com Services LLC) of Pendency of Related Actions (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Golden State FC LLC (now known as Amazon.com Services LLC) (Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 2/24/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court with jury demand. Their case number is CGC-21-597377. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-16935655). Filed byAmazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC, Golden State FC LLC (now known as Amazon.com Services LLC). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan Cooney in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Denicia "JP" Prather in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Zane Brown in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cooney, Megan) (Filed on 2/24/2022) Modified on 2/25/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less