This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 08:34:57 (UTC).

GUCCIONE v. BANKS et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 GUCCIONE filed an Other lawsuit against BANKS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01910

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOYCE E. GUCCIONE

Arlington Hts., IL 60004

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

MADISON CAWTHORN

JIM BANKS

LAUREN BOEBERT

TED BUDD

MATT GAETZ

PAUL GOSAR

MARK GREEN

DARRELL ISSA

RONNY JACKSON

MIKE KELLY

RALPH NORMAN

DEVIN NUNES

W. GREGORY STEUBE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Defendant Attorneys

Brooks McKinly Hanner

Attorney at OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL FOR U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Sarah Edith Clouse

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Todd Barry Tatelman

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Douglas N. Letter

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER: Advising plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 9/13/21 or Court may deem matter as conceded. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: JOYCE E. GUCCIONE, 4233 N. Highland Ave, Arlington Hts., IL 60004 (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/6/21. (DJS) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of her obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to: JOYCE E. GUCCIONE, 4233 N. Highland Ave., Arlington Hts., IL 60004 (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/6/21. (DJS) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#9

(#9) Receipt on 08/06/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021CA001671 B. (ztd) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#6

(#6) ERRATA Notice of Removal by JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE re Notice of QC- New Case,. (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks McKinly Hanner on behalf of JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE (Hanner, Brooks) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Edith Clouse on behalf of JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE (Tatelman, Todd) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: Advising plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 9/13/21 or Court may deem matter as conceded. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: JOYCE E. GUCCIONE, 4233 N. Highland Ave, Arlington Hts., IL 60004 (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/6/21. (DJS) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of her obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to: JOYCE E. GUCCIONE, 4233 N. Highland Ave., Arlington Hts., IL 60004 (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/6/21. (DJS) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Receipt on 08/06/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021CA001671 B. (ztd) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Edith Clouse on behalf of JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE (Clouse, Sarah).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 7/23/2021. (znmw) Modified on 7/20/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ERRATA Notice of Removal by JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE re Notice of QC- New Case,. (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to douglas.letter@mail.house.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks McKinly Hanner on behalf of JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE (Hanner, Brooks) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Edith Clouse on behalf of JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE (Tatelman, Todd) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of JIM BANKS, LAUREN BOEBERT, TED BUDD, MADISON CAWTHORN, MATT GAETZ, PAUL GOSAR, MARK GREEN, DARRELL ISSA, RONNY JACKSON, MIKE KELLY, RALPH NORMAN, DEVIN NUNES, W. GREGORY STEUBE (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2021 CA 001671 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by MATT GAETZ, MIKE KELLY, LAUREN BOEBERT, PAUL GOSAR, DARRELL ISSA, RALPH NORMAN, JIM BANKS, W. GREGORY STEUBE, MARK GREEN, TED BUDD, DEVIN NUNES, RONNY JACKSON, MADISON CAWTHORN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit D.C. Sup. Ct. Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Edith Clouse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Neal Letter Esq.