This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2020 at 08:34:49 (UTC).

Gubin et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Gubin filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-11321

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephanie Gubin

Alan Gubin

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John G. Beggan

Attorney at Christopher D. Smith, PA

Suite 203, 5391 Lakewood Ranch Blvd

Sarasota, FL 34240

Christopher D. Smith, Sr.

Attorney at Christopher D. Smith, PA

Suite 203, 5391 Lakewood Ranch Blvd

Sarasota, FL 34240

Defendant Attorneys

Brian T. Guthrie

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

19 #1

*Restricted*

#19

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#10

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:20-cv-01744. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order (CTO-224) transferring case to District of New Jersey re: MDL case number: 2738. (AG) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ENDORSED ORDER granting the joint motion to stay all deadlines pending transfer to MDL No. 2738. (Doc. #16 ). This case is stayed pending transfer to the MDL. The Clerk is directed to stay and administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/21/2020. (DMD) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Transfer to MDL No. 2738 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Guthrie, Brian) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alan Gubin, Stephanie Gubin. Related case(s): yes (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN of service executed on 08/04/2020 by Stephanie Gubin, Alan Gubin as to Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN of service executed on 08/04/2020 by Stephanie Gubin, Alan Gubin as to Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***TERMINATED, contacted counsel to refile using proper event.***PROOF of service by Alan Gubin, Stephanie Gubin. (Smith, Christopher) Modified text on 8/10/2020 (LNR). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/30/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/30/2020. (TWL) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (MCB) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#6) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-1744-T-33SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Alan Gubin, Stephanie Gubin re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Alan Gubin, Stephanie Gubin. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Alan Gubin, Stephanie Gubin. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Alan Gubin, Stephanie Gubin. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17113611) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN TERRY GUTHRIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT A. JAMES