This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 08:37:28 (UTC).

Steven Guarnaccia v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Steven Guarnaccia filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01219

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Guarnaccia

Defendants

FCA US LLC

FCA US, LLC

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David N Barry

Attorney at Barry Law Firm

11845 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 1270

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorney

Matthew M Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates Conter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement #18 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders ALL proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for 60 days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Settlement JOINT filed by Plaintiff Steven Guarnaccia. (Barry, David) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

17 #1

Declaration in support of opposition to plaintiffs' motion for attorney fee

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Steven Guarnaccia.. (Barry, David) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

14 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

12 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

12 #1

Declaration Declaration of Erik Whitman

12 #12

Main Document

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement #18 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders ALL proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for 60 days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Settlement JOINT filed by Plaintiff Steven Guarnaccia. (Barry, David) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of opposition to plaintiffs' motion for attorney fees)(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Steven Guarnaccia.. (Barry, David) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court DENIES the Requests for Leave of Matthew M. Proudfoot to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference and the Motion hearing. #13 #14 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST for Leave of Matthew M. Proudfoot to Appear for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Hearing Telephonically filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. Request set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST for Leave of Matthew M. Proudfoot to Appear for Scheduling Conference Telephonically filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. Request set for hearing on 8/30/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Steven Guarnaccia. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Erik Whitman, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Barry, David) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, FCA US, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Steven Guarnaccia. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/4/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2021-01204165-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-31645612 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant