This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2021 at 08:34:13 (UTC).

Guardado v. South Florida ENT Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Guardado filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against South Florida ENT Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61218

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anayda Guardado

Defendant

South Florida ENT Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Martoccio

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

4890 W. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to South Florida ENT Associates, Inc.. (pcs) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

4 #1

Summon(s)

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (co) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to South Florida ENT Associates, Inc.. (pcs) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against South Florida ENT Associates, Inc., filed by Anayda Guardado. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (co) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against South Florida ENT Associates, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-14758546, filed by Anayda Guardado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where South Florida ENT Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary James Martoccio