This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 07:34:35 (UTC).

Guard v. Cintron et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 Guard filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cintron. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02134

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glenn Guard

Defendants

Does I-X

Charlotte Cintron

ABC Insurance Companies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David C. Indiano-Vicic

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, PSC

207 Del Parque Street, Third Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, P.S.C.

207 Del Parque Street; 3Rd Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

Vanesa Vicens

Attorney at Indiano & Williams, PSC

207 Del Parque Street, Third Floor

San Juan, PR 00912

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of Glenn Guard (Vicens, Vanesa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Charlotte Cintron (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of Glenn Guard (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6723008.), filed by Glenn Guard. Service due by 3/16/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Indiano-Vicic, David) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of Glenn Guard (Vicens, Vanesa) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Charlotte Cintron (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of Glenn Guard (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6723008.), filed by Glenn Guard. Service due by 3/16/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Indiano-Vicic, David) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less