This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2023 at 11:17:05 (UTC).

Guaranteed Rate Inc v. Locklear

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Guaranteed Rate Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Locklear. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00756

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guaranteed Rate Inc

Defendant

Jodie Locklear

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brittany Tanya Bihun

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

A Victor Rawl, Jr

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

Defendant Attorney

J Scott Kozacki

Attorney at Willcox Buyck and Williams

Po Box 1909

Florence, SC 29503-1909

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Response filed by Jodie Locklear.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/28/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Kozacki, J) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Jodie Locklear. Response to Motion due by 7/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Kozacki, J) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

14 #4

Exhibit 4 - AAA Construction Rules

14 #3

Exhibit 3 - Letter Demanding Arbitration

14 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Complaint with Exhibits

14 #1

Exhibit 1 - Miller Affidavit with Exhibits

14 #14

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Brittany Tanya Bihun for September 22, 2022 through October 7, 2022 (Bihun, Brittany) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#10

(#10) Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Guaranteed Rate Inc.(Rawl, A) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#9

(#9) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Guaranteed Rate Inc.(Rawl, A) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#8

(#8) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Guaranteed Rate Inc.(Rawl, A) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#7

(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/12/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 4/26/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/6/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/1/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/1/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/22/2022, Discovery due by 9/19/2022, Motion in Limine due by 11/18/2022, Motions due by 10/3/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/28/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 12/19/2022, Mediation Due by 10/17/2022. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 3/23/2022. (lgib, ) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

1 #5

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Exhibit D - Arbitration Demand

1 #3

Exhibit C - Rehabilitation Loan Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B - Homeowner/Contractor Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Response filed by Jodie Locklear.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/28/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Kozacki, J) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response to Motion due by 7/25/2022. Signed by Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 7/14/2022. (lgib, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Jodie Locklear. Response to Motion due by 7/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Kozacki, J) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Guaranteed Rate Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/15/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miller Affidavit with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Complaint with Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter Demanding Arbitration, #4 Exhibit 4 - AAA Construction Rules)No proposed order.(Rawl, A) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ENTRY: Informal telephone status conference held on 5/5/22 with counsel appearing for Plaintiff/Petitioner Guaranteed Rate Inc. and Defendant/Respondent Jodie Locklear. Attorneys introduced themselves, provided the Court with an overview of the case, and discussed their respective positions on the Court permitting discovery and further briefing regarding Guaranteed Rate Inc.'s Petition and Complaint to Compel Arbitration (ECF No. #1 ). The Court noted it will not permit discovery. The Court advised of the acceptability of Plaintiff/Petitioner filing a motion (and supporting memorandum) to compel arbitration with an accompanying proposed briefing schedule. Court reporter not present. (lgib, ) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Brittany Tanya Bihun for September 22, 2022 through October 7, 2022 (Bihun, Brittany) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Informal Telephone Discovery Hearing set for 5/5/2022 02:00 PM before Honorable Sherri A Lydon. Plaintiff's counsel shall provide the court and the parties with a dial-in number and passcode for the call. (lgib, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Guaranteed Rate Inc.(Rawl, A) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Guaranteed Rate Inc.(Rawl, A) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Guaranteed Rate Inc.(Rawl, A) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/12/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 4/26/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/6/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/1/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/1/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/22/2022, Discovery due by 9/19/2022, Motion in Limine due by 11/18/2022, Motions due by 10/3/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/28/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 12/19/2022, Mediation Due by 10/17/2022. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 3/23/2022. (lgib, ) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jodie Locklear.(Kozacki, J) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jodie Locklear.(Kozacki, J) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Guaranteed Rate Inc. Jodie Locklear served on 3/15/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. (Bihun, Brittany) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Guaranteed Rate Inc. (lgib, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jodie Locklear ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10379563), filed by Guaranteed Rate Inc. Service due by 6/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Homeowner/Contractor Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Rehabilitation Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Arbitration Demand, #5 Certificate of Service) (lgib, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Guaranteed Rate, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerome Scott Kozacki Esq.