This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 08:28:27 (UTC).

GUANLAO et al v. DAVE & BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 GUANLAO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAVE BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-19580

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAINIER GUANLAO

KRISTY GUANLAO

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

DAVE & BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC.

DAVE & BUSTER'S, INC.

DAVE & BUSTER'S ENTERTAINMENT, INC.

WOODBRIDGE CENTER PROPERTY LLC

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC. D/B/A WOODBRIDGE CENTER MALL

RAW THRILLS, INC.

JOHN DOES 1-10

ABC CORPS. 1-10

JOHN DOES 11-20

ABC CORPS 11-20

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAUN I. BLICK

Attorney at Blick Law LLC

220 Davidson Avenue, Suite 300

Somerset, NJ 08873

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

ROBYN F. MCGRATH

Attorney at SWEENEY & SHEEHAN

216 Haddon Avenue, Suite 500

Westmont, NJ 08108

JENNIFER MARY BRUDER

Attorney at HAWORTH BARBER & GERSTMAN, LLC

505 Main Street, Suite 212

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAVE & BUSTER'S ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (MCGRATH, ROBYN) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAVE & BUSTER'S, INC. identifying Dave & Buster's Entertainment, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCGRATH, ROBYN) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAVE & BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC. identifying Dave & Buster's Entertainment, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCGRATH, ROBYN) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

8 #1

Certificate of Service

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Arbitration case for 2/2/2022 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/15/2021. (spc) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE re #5 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,. (BRUDER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

5 #1

Certification

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Raw Thrills, Inc ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S ENTERTAINMENT, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S, INC., WOODBRIDGE CENTER PROPERTY LLC by RAW THRILLS, INC..(BRUDER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Raw Thrills, Inc. Attorney JENNIFER MARY BRUDER for RAW THRILLS, INC. added. (BRUDER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER MARY BRUDER on behalf of RAW THRILLS, INC. (BRUDER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit B

1 #5

Exhibit A

1 #4

Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 11.2

1 #3

Proof of Service

1 #2

Proof of Filing

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAVE & BUSTER'S ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (MCGRATH, ROBYN) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAVE & BUSTER'S, INC. identifying Dave & Buster's Entertainment, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCGRATH, ROBYN) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAVE & BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC. identifying Dave & Buster's Entertainment, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCGRATH, ROBYN) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE re #4 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCGRATH, ROBYN) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Arbitration case for 2/2/2022 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/15/2021. (spc) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE re #5 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,. (BRUDER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against RAW THRILLS, INC. by DAVE & BUSTER'S ENTERTAINMENT, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(MCGRATH, ROBYN) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Raw Thrills, Inc ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S ENTERTAINMENT, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S, INC., WOODBRIDGE CENTER PROPERTY LLC by RAW THRILLS, INC..(BRUDER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Proposed Order at D.E. #3 filed by J. BRUDER on 12/8/2021 was submitted incorrectly as an Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. For future reference please use the "Proposed Order" event found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (bt, ) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Raw Thrills, Inc. Attorney JENNIFER MARY BRUDER for RAW THRILLS, INC. added. (BRUDER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER MARY BRUDER on behalf of RAW THRILLS, INC. (BRUDER, JENNIFER) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WOODBRIDGE CENTER PROPERTY LLC, DAVE & BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC., BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S ENTERTAINMENT, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number 5789-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12949355), filed by WOODBRIDGE CENTER PROPERTY LLC, DAVE & BUSTER'S OF NEW JERSEY, INC., BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S, INC., DAVE & BUSTER'S ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Filing, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 11.2, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B)(MCGRATH, ROBYN) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brookfield Properties Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVE & BUSTER'S OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBYN FARRELL MCGRATH(Designation Retained)