This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2021 at 14:41:42 (UTC).

Guadalupe Gaona et al v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Guadalupe Gaona filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Patrick J. Walsh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02139

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Patrick J. Walsh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Guadalupe Avila Gaona

Miguel Hernandez

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Crown Dodge

Crown Dodge a California Corporation doing business as Crown Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steve Mikhov

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Amy-Lyn Morse

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Daniel Max Kalinowski

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLC

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Richard L Stuhlbarg

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

Michael Chung

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice #14 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) See Order for specifics. (jp) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Michael Chung in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Chung, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of Daniel Kalinowski re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,,,,,,,,, 10 filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez. (Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#11

(#11) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez. Amendment to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #9 (Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#9

(#9) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 Days, filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez.. (Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski counsel for Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez. Adding Daniel Kalinowski as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Gaona and Miguel Hernandez. (Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Guadalupe Avila Gaona(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Miguel Hernandez(pty:pla))(Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2019-00533608 Receipt No: ACACDC-25625864 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Michael Chung added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Chung, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice #14 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) See Order for specifics. (jp) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DECLARATION of Michael Chung in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Chung, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Daniel Kalinowski re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,,,,,,,,, 10 filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez. (Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez. Amendment to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #9 (Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS. This overburdened court and its staff do not have time to communicate repeatedly with counsel in an effort to have them follow this Court's rules and orders. Counsel have failed to comply with the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference and the attached Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates in one or more respects. For example, counsel may have (1) failed to file a Joint 26(f) Report at all, (2) failed to provide all of the information required by the Order, (3) failed to attach a Schedule, or (4) failed to complete the Schedule properly. Counsel are ordered to show cause why each side should not be sanctioned in the amount of $500 for their failure to comply with the Order. Counsel whose signature appears on the Joint 26(f) Report must file a declaration stating who was (1) responsible for meeting with opposing counsel, (2) responsible for preparing and reviewing the Report and ensuing its accuracy and compliance with the Order, and (3) responsible for filing the Report. The declaration should state that persons name (only if the person is an attorney) and the person's position (partner, associate, paralegal, assistant, secretary, etc.). The declaration shall also state why the Report failed to comply with the Order. If no Report was filed, the declaration must state who was (1) responsible for calendaring the date for meeting with counsel and filing the Report, (2) responsible for responsible for meeting with opposing counsel, and (3) responsible for filing the Report. The same information as to name and position must be provided as well as an explanation as to why no Report was filed. In addition, the parties are ordered to review the Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conference and the attached Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates carefully, and to provide a Report and a Schedule that provides specific dates for all of the relevant items in the Schedule. The dates must comply with the time frames in the "weeks before trial" column and the required days of the week: a Monday (not a holiday) for the pretrial conference and last day for hearing motions and a Tuesday (not a holiday) for trial. The declarations, Report, and Schedule are due within five Court days. By that date, Plaintiffs are also required to identify the person who will be lead trial counsel. The filing of compliant declarations, Report, and Schedule will be a sufficient response to this Order to Show Cause. The scheduling conference date is vacated. The parties are urged to conduct themselves in a professional manner and to make every effort to agree on dates. Further failures to comply with this court's rules and orders, including the rules and orders of the Central District will result in sanctions against one or both parties.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 Days, filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez.. (Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski counsel for Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez. Adding Daniel Kalinowski as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Gaona and Miguel Hernandez. (Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Guadalupe Avila Gaona(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Miguel Hernandez(pty:pla))(Kalinowski, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIVED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez pursuant to Cal, Rules of Court, rules 3.760 and 3.770. as to Crown Dodge. (RECEIVED IN VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/24/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (FILED IN VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/12/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Crown Dodge. (FILED IN VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/12/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(Attorney Richard L Stuhlbarg added to party Crown Dodge(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Chung added to party Crown Dodge(pty:dft))(lh) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Crown Dodge, Does, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Guadalupe Avila Gaona, Miguel Hernandez. (FILED IN VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/20/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Chung, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Chung, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2019-00533608 Receipt No: ACACDC-25625864 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Michael Chung added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Chung, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Max Kalinowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy-Lyn Morse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steve Borislav Mikhov