This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2020 at 16:49:39 (UTC).

Guadalupe et al v. Municipality of San Juan et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Guadalupe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Municipality of San Juan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01268

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sandra Maria Guadalupe

Wilfredo Guadalupe

Conjugal Partnership Guadalupe-Guadalupe

Defendants

John Does I-X

Defendants ABC

QBE Seguros

Municipality of San Juan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Francisco J. Colon-Pagan

Attorney at Colon & Colon PSC

Po Box 9023355

San Juan, PR 00902-3355

Margarita Rosado-Toledo

P.O. Box 9023355

San Juan, PR 00902-3355

Defendant Attorney

Johanna M. Smith-Miro

166 Ave. De La Constitucin

San Juan, PR 00901

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #3

Summons Municipality of San Juan

1 #4

Summons QBE Seguros

#3

3 #1

Summons in a Civil Action

#4

#5

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Johanna M. Smith-Miro on behalf of Defendant QBE Seguros.(Smith-Miro, Johanna) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/30/2020.(EES) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 7/29/2020. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 6/30/2020. (EES) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time until July 29, 2020 to File Answer filed by Johanna M. Smith-Miro on behalf of QBE Seguros Responses due by 7/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Smith-Miro, Johanna) Modified on 6/30/2020 to edit motion title (vso). (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Margarita Rosado-Toledo on behalf of Sandra Maria Guadalupe, Wilfredo Guadalupe, Conjugal Partnership Guadalupe-Guadalupe. (Rosado-Toledo, Margarita) Modified on 6/10/2020 to add filer and edit docket text (vso). (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Municipality of San Juan and QBE Seguros. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young. (rim) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants ABC, John Does I-X, Municipality of San Juan, QBE Seguros ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6908656.), filed by Sandra Maria Guadalupe, Wilfredo Guadalupe. Service due by 9/8/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Municipality of San Juan, #4 Summons QBE Seguros)(Colon-Pagan, Francisco) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less