This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2020 at 09:11:25 (UTC).

Guada Technologies LLC v. Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Guada Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00992

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guada Technologies LLC

Defendant

Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

David R. Bennett

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Affidavit

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. answer due 10/19/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/2020. (nms) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Guada Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) Modified on 9/15/2020 (nms). (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to 09/17/2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. answer due 9/17/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/17/2020. (nms) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to 09/17/2020 - filed by Guada Technologies LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Guada Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01000-RGA, 1:20-cv-00992-RGA, 1:20-cv-00993-RGA, 1:20-cv-00998-RGA, 1:20-cv-00999-RGA(kmd) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett, filed by Guada Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2020. (nms) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Guada Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guada Technologies LLC. Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00992-RGA, 1:20-cv-00993-RGA, 1:20-cv-00998-RGA, 1:20-cv-00999-RGA, 1:20-cv-01000-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Guada Technologies LLC. (myr) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,231,379. (myr) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Advanced Drainage Systems, Inc. - (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3087770) - filed by Guada Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) Modified on 7/29/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Guada Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Advanced Drainage Systems is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Bennett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong