This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2022 at 08:25:16 (UTC).

GT v. Walled Lake Consolidated School District et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 GT filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Walled Lake Consolidated School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen J. Murphy, III and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-12364

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen J. Murphy, III

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GT

Defendants

Walled Lake Consolidated School District

Walled Lake Consolidated School District, Board of Education

Michael Lonze

Nicholas Russo

Michelle Kalhorn

Kelly Smith

Kathren O'Brien

Julianne Young

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth Kamm Abdnour

Attorney at Elizabeth Abdnour Law, PLLC

1100 W. Saginaw St., Suite 4A-2

Lansing, MI 48915

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy J. Mullins

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W. Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Floor

Troy, MI 48084

Travis M. Comstock

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W Big Beaver Rd., Suite 1000

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit 1

3 #2

Exhibit 2

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis M. Comstock on behalf of All Defendants. (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Walled Lake Consolidated School District, Board of Education waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022. (Abdnour, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michelle Kalhorn waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Michael Lonze waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Kathren O'Brien waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Nicholas Russo waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Kelly Smith waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Walled Lake Consolidated School District waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Julianne Young waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022. (Abdnour, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michelle Kalhorn waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Michael Lonze waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Kathren O'Brien waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Nicholas Russo waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Kelly Smith waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Walled Lake Consolidated School District waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022; Julianne Young waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022. (Abdnour, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Walled Lake Consolidated School District, Board of Education waiver sent on 10/31/2022, answer due 12/30/2022. (Abdnour, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis M. Comstock on behalf of All Defendants. (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by GT obo Jane Doe against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Abdnour, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9079174 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Abdnour, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less