This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:10:39 (UTC).

GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE v. TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00314

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE

2719 Hollywood Boulevard, 1St Floor

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant

TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW JON PALMA

Attorney at MAGER PARAUS - HOLLYWOOD FL

2719 Hollywood Boulevard, Second Floor

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL ADAM PACKER

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY ETC - FORT LAUDERDALE FL

1 E Broward Blvd Ste 500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/3/20. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/21/2020. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. Mediation to take place by 8/28/2020. Mediation Report due by 9/14/2020. (bkp) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PALMA, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE. (PALMA, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent Tower Hill Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, P.C., Other Affiliate GSD Construction Services, LLC as assignee of Phillip Horne and Shirley Horne, Other Affiliate Mager Paruas, LLC for TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (PACKER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE (PALMA, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER ON JURISDICTION signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 12/19/19. Notice due no later than 1/2/2020. (tss) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 12/13/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/27/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/27/2020., Discovery due by 4/13/2020. (kdm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW JON PALMA on behalf of GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE (kdm) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT to counsel for GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE (tss) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to counsel for GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE (tss) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tss) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $400.) filed by GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE. (tss) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #13

Appendix State - RFA

1 #12

Appendix State - NOTD CR

1 #9

Appendix State - Summons Issued

1 #8

Appendix State - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Appendix State - Complaint

1 #6

Appendix State - Docket

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadline - CRD to prepare PTO by 6/30/2020. (tss) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#14) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (bkp) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 2/3/20. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/21/2020. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. Mediation to take place by 8/28/2020. Mediation Report due by 9/14/2020. (bkp) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PALMA, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE. (PALMA, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent Tower Hill Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, P.C., Other Affiliate GSD Construction Services, LLC as assignee of Phillip Horne and Shirley Horne, Other Affiliate Mager Paruas, LLC for TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (PACKER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE (PALMA, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER -- Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/27/2019. (*** None filed to date. ***) (kdm) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER ON JURISDICTION signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 12/19/19. Notice due no later than 1/2/2020. (tss) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 12/13/2019. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/27/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/27/2020., Discovery due by 4/13/2020. (kdm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW JON PALMA on behalf of GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE (kdm) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings clerk to check status of attorney admission by 12/23/2019. (tss) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT to counsel for GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE (tss) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to counsel for GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE (tss) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tss) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $400.) filed by GSD CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC AS ASSIGNEE FOR PHILLIP HORNE AND SHIRLEY HORNE. (tss) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY from Circuit Court of the 8th Judicial Circuit In and For Alachua County, Florida, case number 2019 CA 002227. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4730733.), filed by TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Appendix State - Docket, #7 Appendix State - Complaint, #8 Appendix State - Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Appendix State - Summons Issued, #10 Appendix State - RFP, #11 Appendix State - NOTD FA, #12 Appendix State - NOTD CR, #13 Appendix State - RFA, #14 Appendix State - NOS Roggs, #15 Appendix State - NOA, #16 Appendix State - NOS Process, #17 Appendix State - MTD, #18 Appendix State - NOH MTD, #19 Appendix State - Deft's Ans Pltf's RFA, #20 Appendix State - Deft's MET Pltf's Roggs/RFP, #21 Appendix State - Pltf's Resp Deft's MTD, #22 Appendix State - Deft's Ntc WD MTD, #23 Appendix State - NOXH MTD) (PACKER, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less