This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2021 at 08:26:28 (UTC).

G.S., by and through his parents and next friends, Brittany and Ryan Schwaigert et al v. Lee et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 G S , by and through his parents and next friends, Brittany and Ryan Schwaigert filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Lee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Annie T. Christoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02552

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Annie T. Christoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

G.S., by and through his parents and next friends, Brittany and Ryan Schwaigert

S.T., by and through her mother and next friend, Emily Tremel

J.M., by and through her mother and next friend, Kimberly Morrise

Defendants

Governor Bill Lee

Shelby County, Tennessee

Amicus Curiae

American Academy of Pediatrics

Tennessee Chapter of the American Academy of Pediatrics

Jordan Carpenter

1257 Wesleyan Place

Memphis, TN 38119

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brice Moffatt Timmons

Attorney at DONATI LAW, PLLC

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

Craig A Edgington

Attorney at DONATI LAW

1545 Union Avenue

Memphis, TN 38104

Jessica Farris Salonus

Attorney at THE SALONUS FIRM

Tennessee, 139 Stonebridge Blvd

Jackson, TN 38305

Robert A. Donati

Attorney at DONATI LAW FIRM, LLP

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

Bryce William Ashby

Attorney at DONATI LAW FIRM, LLP

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

Defendant Attorneys

James R. Newsom, III

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL AND REPORTER

40 S. Main St., Suite 1014

Memphis, TN 38103

Matthew Reed Dowty

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, One Commerce Square

Memphis, TN 38103

Robert W. Wilson

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE TENNESSEE ATTORNEY GENERAL AND REPORTER

40 South Main Street, Suite 1014.

Memphis, TN 38103-1877

Tannera George Gibson

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Charles Silvestri Higgins

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Emmett Lee Whitwell

Attorney at Shelby County Attorney's Office

160 N. Main Street, Suite 950

Memphis, TN 38103

Marlinee C Iverson

Attorney at SHELBY COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

160 N. Main, Ste 950

Memphis, TN 38103

Nathan A. Bicks

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Sarah Elizabeth Stuart

Attorney at BURCH, PORTER & JOHNSON

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Jeffrey B. Dubner

Attorney at DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION

P.O. Box 34553

Washington, DC 20043

Samara M Spence

Attorney at DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION

P.O. Box 34553

Washington, DC 20043

Jordan Kelly Carpenter

1257 Wesleyan Place

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#72

#71

#70

69 #1

Exhibit A

#69

68 #1

Memorandum in Support of Governor Lee's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal

#68

#67

#66

2 #5

Exhibit : Declaration of Sara Cross, MD

2 #4

Exhibit : Declaration of Joi Wilson-Townsend, MD

2 #3

Exhibit : Declaration of Emily Tremel

2 #2

Exhibit : Declaration of Brittany Schwaigert

#2

1 #3

Summons for Shelby County, Tennessee

1 #2

Summons for Gov. Bill Lee

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER denying #68 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/19/21. (shl) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) RESPONSE to Motion re #68 MOTION to Stay filed by Shelby County, Tennessee. (Stuart, Sarah) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Notice of Correction to #69 Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant, Governor Bill Lee's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal of Defendant Governor Bill Lee and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof. (Timmons, Brice) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) RESPONSE to Motion re #68 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Response to Defendant, Governor Bill Lee's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal of Defendant Governor Bill Lee and Incocrporated Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Calabro, Hope) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) MOTION to Stay by Bill Lee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Governor Lee's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal)(Wilson, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) USCA Case Number 21-5915 for #66 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Bill Lee. Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Bill Lee. Transcript needed: y. (btg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #62 Order by Bill Lee. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ATNWDC-3710504. (Newsom, James) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ANSWER to #54 Amended Complaint, by Shelby County, Tennessee.(Gibson, Tannera) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ANSWER to #54 Amended Complaint, by Bill Lee.(Newsom, James) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/17/21. (shl) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A Edgington on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Edgington, Craig) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brice Moffatt Timmons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Timmons, Brice) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Donati on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Donati, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(btg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (btg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of TRO, #2 Exhibit : Declaration of Brittany Schwaigert, #3 Exhibit : Declaration of Emily Tremel, #4 Exhibit : Declaration of Joi Wilson-Townsend, MD, #5 Exhibit : Declaration of Sara Cross, MD)(Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3688583), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Gov. Bill Lee, #3 Summons for Shelby County, Tennessee)(Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Bill Lee is a litigant

Latest cases where American Academy of Pediatrics is a litigant

Latest cases where Shelby County, Tennessee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey B. Dubner