This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:25:25 (UTC).

Gruzebeck v. Fikes

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Gruzebeck filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Fikes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Becky R. Thorson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-03035

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lex Michael Gruzebeck

Owatonna, MN 55060

Respondent

Warden Fikes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Ana H Voss

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

300 S 4Th St Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55415

Ann M Bildtsen

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

300 S 4Th St Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/29/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#3

(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/22/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/17/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-105595) filed by Lex Michael Gruzebeck. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/17/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/29/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/22/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/17/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-105595) filed by Lex Michael Gruzebeck. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 12/17/2019 (JGK). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.