This case was last updated from PACER on 02/27/2021 at 11:53:32 (UTC).

Grundy County v. Allergan PLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Grundy County filed an Other lawsuit against Allergan PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-OP-45300

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.

Hy-Vee, Inc.

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Mylan Institutional Inc.

Cardinal Health 110, LLC

Mallinckrodt LLC

Michael Babich

1-1000 DOES

Cardinal Health 113, LLC

Cardinal Health 200, LLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health 108, LLC

Hy-Vee Pharmacy

Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.

Allergan U.S.A., Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Cameron E. Grant

Attorney at Scharnhorst Ast Kennard Griffin

1100 Walnut Street

Kansas City, MO 64106

James D. Griffin

Attorney at SCHARNHORST AST PC - Kansas City 2

1100 Walnut, Suite 1950

Kansas City, MO 64106

Julie Fix Meyer

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale

7700 Forsyth Blvd.

St. Louis, MO 63105

Peter William Bay

Attorney at Bryan Cave

One Metropolitan Square, Ste. 3600, 211 N. Broadway

St. Louis, MO 63102

Randy J. Soriano

Attorney at Bryan Cave

One Metropolitan Square, Ste. 3600, 211 N. Broadway

St. Louis, MO 63102

Other Attorneys

John F. Edgar

Attorney at Edgar Law Firm

4520 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64111

Terry L. Pabst

Attorney at The Law Offices of Terry Pabst, P.C.

950 Francis Place, Suite 107

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

26 #1

*Restricted*

#26

(#26) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-01195. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#25

(#25) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#24

(#24) TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#23

(#23) ENTRY of Appearance by Cameron E. Grant for Defendants Hy-Vee, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Grant, Cameron) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#22

(#22) ENTRY of Appearance by James D. Griffin for Defendants Hy-Vee, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Griffin, James) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/12/2020)

14 #1

Attachment Proposed Order

#14

(#19) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court City of St. Louis, MO filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Order Dated 12.26.2019, #3 Exhibit C - Stay Order Dated 1.16.2020, #4 Exhibit D - Statement of Interest of The United States of America)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/18/2020)

1 #9

Attachment A

1 #8

Original Filing Form with attachment

1 #7

Attachment C

1 #6

Attachment B

1 #5

Attachment A

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet with attachments

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-01195. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ENTRY of Appearance by Cameron E. Grant for Defendants Hy-Vee, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Grant, Cameron) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ENTRY of Appearance by James D. Griffin for Defendants Hy-Vee, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Griffin, James) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY IN SUPPORT re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court City of St. Louis, MO filed by Plaintiff Grundy County. (Edgar, John) Modified on 9/25/2020 (MCB). [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court City of St. Louis, MO filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Order Dated 12.26.2019, #3 Exhibit C - Stay Order Dated 1.16.2020, #4 Exhibit D - Statement of Interest of The United States of America)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice: by Plaintiff Grundy County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A 4:18-cv-11958, Doc. 36, #2 Exhibit Ex. B 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 4, #3 Exhibit Ex. C 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 70, #4 Exhibit Ex. D 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 130, #5 Exhibit Ex. E 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 232, #6 Exhibit Ex. F MDL No. 2804, Doc. 31, #7 Exhibit Ex. G No. 18-4054, Doc. 45-2, #8 Exhibit Ex. H No. 1:18-op-45936, Doc. 2, #9 Exhibit Ex. I No. 1:18-op-45936, Doc. 22, #10 Exhibit Ex. J No. 1:18-op-46120, Doc. 43, #11 Exhibit Ex. K No. 1:17-md-02804, Doc. 1061, #12 Exhibit Ex. L No. 1:17-op-45017, Doc. 43, #13 Exhibit Ex. M No. 8:18-cv-01947)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC.. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Peter William Bay for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Bay, Peter) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 201, Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. Parent companies: Cardinal Health, Inc., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, case number 2022-CC00954, Jury Demand,, filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet with attachments, #5 Attachment A, #6 Attachment B, #7 Attachment C, #8 Original Filing Form with attachment, #9 Attachment A)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/29/2020.] (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hy-Vee, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Institutional Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation is a litigant