Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2020 at 07:01:54 (UTC).

Grundstrom v. Wilco Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Grundstrom filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Wilco Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03445

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julie Grundstrom

Defendant

Wilco Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah D Ball

Attorney at Winter and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Craig McKenzie Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-5005

Jack Bruce Winters, Jr

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Georg Michael Capielo

Attorney at Winter and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Alex Michael Tomasevic

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Corban James Porter

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning and Berman

1401 Willow Pass Rd Ste 700

Concord, CA 94520

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by Wilco Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Wilton Reassurance Company for Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint byWilco Life Insurance Company. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/30/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 6/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wilco Life Insurance Company.. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 6/12/2020) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Grundstrom. Wilco Life Insurance Company served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 6/8/2020) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Wilco Life Insurance Company. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action) against Wilco Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14492598.). Filed byJulie Grundstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by Wilco Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Wilton Reassurance Company for Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint byWilco Life Insurance Company. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/30/2020. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 6/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wilco Life Insurance Company.. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Porter, Corban) (Filed on 6/12/2020) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Grundstrom. Wilco Life Insurance Company served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 6/8/2020) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Wilco Life Insurance Company. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/4/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action) against Wilco Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14492598.). Filed byJulie Grundstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tomasevic, Alex) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilco Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corban James Porter