This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2021 at 08:08:36 (UTC).

Grullon v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Grullon filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Chris M. McAliley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23022

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Chris M. McAliley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

April Grullon

Defendant

The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Philip Dabdoub

Attorney at Dabdoub Law Firm, PA.

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 1202

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Geannina Andrea Burgos

Attorney at Dabdoub Law Firm, PA

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd., Ste 1202

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

Latanae L. Parker

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.

9100 S. Dadeland Blvd., Ste. 1500

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

#4

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Affidavit

#6

#7

#8

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 8/29/2022 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 8/23/2022 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 10/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by April Grullon (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Parker, Latanae) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Parker, Latanae) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Latanae L. Parker on behalf of The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. Attorney Latanae L. Parker added to party The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Parker, Latanae) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by April Grullon. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Report and Recommendation. SCHEDULING ORDER: (Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams, Calendar Call set for 8/23/2022 11:00 AM before Judge Kathleen M. Williams) Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (ebz) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14943616, filed by April Grullon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Latanae L Parker