This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2020 at 06:08:43 (UTC).

Gruenwald v. Toro Company, The et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 Gruenwald filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Toro Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Becky R. Thorson and Paul A. Magnuson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02294

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Magnuson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Gruenwald

Defendants

Toro International, Inc.

Toro Compny, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth A Wexler

Amanda M Williams

Karla M Gluek

Mark Tamblyn

James Joseph Pepper

Daniel E Gustafson

Defendant Attorneys

Heidi A O Fisher

Ellie J Barragry

Randall J Pattee

Andrew S Hansen

 

Court Documents

#26

#39

#38

#37

#35

#34

33 #1

Exhibit(s) A-D

#33

32 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

23 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Toro Company, The. (Fisher, Heidi) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Toro Compny, The. filed by Scott Gruenwald. No summons requested. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Plan and Non-Dispositive Motions are split into Phase One and Phase Two as follows: Discovery Cut-Off Phase One: August 1, 2020 Fact; September 1, 2020 Expert; Discovery Cut-Off Phase Two:February 1, 2021 Fact; April 1, 2021 - Expert. Non-Dispositive Motions Phase One: September 1, 2020; Non-Dispositive Motions Phase Two: April 1, 2021. Dispositive Motions Phase One: November 1, 2020; Dispositive Motions Phase Two: May 1, 2021. Ready for Jury Trial by July 1, 2021. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT, 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT(LLM) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#36) TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting (30) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT; granting (28) Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings in case 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT. The Court orally granted these motions at the Rule 16 scheduling conference. Plaintiffs are to file their amended pleadings as a new filing. Entered by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 1/16/2020. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-02294-PAM-BRT, 0:19-cv-02345-PAM-BRT(ALT) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #30 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) filed by Scott Gruenwald.(Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #30 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Scott Gruenwald.(Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Declaration of Amanda M. Williams in Support of #30 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) filed by Scott Gruenwald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) filed by Scott Gruenwald. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #30 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings (Combined Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint) filed by Scott Gruenwald. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7096185 filed by Scott Gruenwald. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Gruenwald. Toro Compny, The served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019; Toro International, Inc. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark Tamblyn for Scott Gruenwald. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/21/2019. (NAH) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark J. Tamblyn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7094205 filed by Scott Gruenwald. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Joseph Pepper for Scott Gruenwald. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 8/20/2019. (NAH) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James J. Pepper. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7093318 filed by Scott Gruenwald. (Williams, Amanda) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kenneth A. Wexler, Mark J. Tamblyn, James Pepper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Toro Compny, The, Toro International, Inc. (MMP) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2294 (PAM/BRT). (MMP) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Toro Company, The, Toro International, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7090961) filed by Scott Gruenwald. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Amanda) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (MMP). (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less