This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2022 at 07:50:48 (UTC).

Gruelle v. American Medical Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 Gruelle filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R David Proctor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01697

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia Gruelle

Defendant

American Medical Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Rogers Krebs

Attorney at Krebs Law, LLC

2123 9Th Street, Suite 110

Tuscaloosa, AL 35401

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against American Medical Systems Inc, filed by Cynthia Gruelle.(KEK) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by Cynthia Gruelle. (Krebs, John) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - this case is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Case with prejudice #2 ; the motion is GRANTED; this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the parties are to bear their own costs, expenses and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/12/2022. (KAM) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - this case is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Case with prejudice #2 ; the motion is GRANTED; this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the parties are to bear their own costs, expenses and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/12/2022. (KAM) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by Cynthia Gruelle. (Krebs, John) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3985101. related document #1 COMPLAINT against American Medical Systems Inc, filed by Cynthia Gruelle.(KEK). (Krebs, John) Modified on 12/28/2021 NDAL rec# B4601117836 (KAM). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Medical Systems Inc, filed by Cynthia Gruelle.(KEK) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant