This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 04:55:15 (UTC).

Grube et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Grube filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00638

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Suzanne Grube

Willard Titus Grube

Defendants

Boston Scientific Corporation

C R Bard Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura J. Simon

Attorney at Dalton & Associates P.A.

1106 West Tenth Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorneys

Colleen D. Shields

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

222 Delaware Avenue, 7Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alexandra Rogin

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

222 Delaware Avenue, 7Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher J. Casolaro

 

Court Documents

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Settlement by Boston Scientific Corporation (Rogin, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#62

(#62) Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 re 60 Oral Order by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Rogin, Alexandra) Modified on 6/15/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

46 #2

Exhibit B

46 #1

Exhibit A

#46

Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2020 to discuss the case status, trial date, and defendant's request for additional discovery ( #62 ). The parties shall confer and file a proposed schedule by mid-August that contemplates the filing of reply briefs and statements of undisputed facts and responses thereto on the pending motions ( #45 & #46 ), along with the other directives pertaining to summary judgment ordered by the Court. The defendant's request for additional discovery is granted, but the additional discovery is limited. See transcript for more details.(Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (mdb) Modified on 6/19/2020 (mdb). (Entered: 06/19/2020)

45 #6

Exhibit F

45 #5

Exhibit E

45 #4

Exhibit D

#45

Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2020 to discuss the case status, trial date, and defendant's request for additional discovery ( #62 ). The parties shall confer and file a proposed schedule by mid-August that contemplates the filing of reply briefs and statements of undisputed facts and responses thereto on the pending motions ( #45 & #46 ), along with the other directives pertaining to summary judgment ordered by the Court. The defendant's request for additional discovery is granted, but the additional discovery is limited. See transcript for more details.(Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (mdb) Modified on 6/19/2020 (mdb). (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Suzanne Grube on May 22, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. ET (Geist, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)

#7

(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER # 275 (Docket Control Order - C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING C. R. BARD, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 7 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The stay on the Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases are incorporated in the C. R. Bard Wave 7 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 7 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 7 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Bard Wave 7 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Suzanne Grube, Willard Titus Grube against C. R. Bard, Inc. ("Bard"). (Kent, Amanda) (Modified on 8/27/2013 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 08/26/2013)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by MARGARET WILSON PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS, on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Kent, Amanda) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2013)

#3

(#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 72 (FOURTH AMENDED Discovery Scheduling Order for Group 1A Cases) entered on 03/12/2013 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 03/25/2013)

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C. R. Bard, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 03/22/2013)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C. R. Bard, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 03/22/2013)

148 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORAL ORDER re #64 Notice of Settlement - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before 2/21/2021. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/29/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Settlement by Boston Scientific Corporation (Rogin, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of the 6/19/2020 Minute Entry has been corrected. (mdb) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2020 to discuss the case status, trial date, and defendant's request for additional discovery ( #62 ). The parties shall confer and file a proposed schedule by mid-August that contemplates the filing of reply briefs and statements of undisputed facts and responses thereto on the pending motions ( #45 & #46 ), along with the other directives pertaining to summary judgment ordered by the Court. The defendant's request for additional discovery is granted, but the additional discovery is limited. See transcript for more details.(Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (mdb) Modified on 6/19/2020 (mdb). (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Having reviewed #62 the parties' Local Rule 81.2 Statement, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephone Conference is set for 6/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Counsel shall provide a dial-in number for the teleconference by emailing this Court's judicial administrator. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/15/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 re 60 Oral Order by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Rogin, Alexandra) Modified on 6/15/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Nathaniel Bigelow filed by Willard Titus Grube, Suzanne Grube. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/10/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Nathaniel Bigelow - filed by Suzanne Grube, Willard Titus Grube. (Simon, Laura) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#60) ORAL ORDER - WHEREAS, pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, "[i]n any case transferred or removed to this Court, within 21 days of the filing of the case with the Clerk, the parties shall submit a statement identifying all pending matters which require judicial action"; WHEREAS, this case was opened in the District of Delaware on 5/12/2020 making the Local Rule 81.2 Statement due on or before 6/2/2020; and WHEREAS, to date no statement has been filed. THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the requisite Local Rule 81.2 Statement on or before 6/15/2020. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/8/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J. Simon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Simon, Laura) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRETRIAL ORDER # 283 (Amended Docket Control Order C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 275. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 7 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Active Bard Wave 7 Cases) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Willard Titus Grube on May 22, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. ET (Geist, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by C. R. Bard, Inc. of Suzanne Grube on May 22, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. ET (Geist, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER # 275 (Docket Control Order - C. R. Bard Wave 7 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING C. R. BARD, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 7 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The stay on the Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases are incorporated in the C. R. Bard Wave 7 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 7 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 7 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2187; Bard Wave 7 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Suzanne Grube, Willard Titus Grube. (Solomon, Amy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Suzanne Grube, Willard Titus Grube against C. R. Bard, Inc. ("Bard"). (Kent, Amanda) (Modified on 8/27/2013 to add party filer) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 08/26/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by MARGARET WILSON PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS, on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Kent, Amanda) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 72 (FOURTH AMENDED Discovery Scheduling Order for Group 1A Cases) entered on 03/12/2013 in MDL 2187 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 03/25/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to C. R. Bard, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 03/22/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2297114. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/12/2020.] (Entered: 03/22/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant