This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/27/2020 at 09:12:42 (UTC).

Growcentia, Inc. v. Jemie B.V.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 Growcentia, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Jemie B. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina Y. Wang and William J. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02619

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Growcentia, Inc.

Defendant

Jemie B.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Scot Tamkin

Brian J. Janura

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Michael Bell

Brian Patrick O'Donnell

 

Court Documents

#22

#16

#15

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Brian J. Janura by Brian J. Janura on behalf of Growcentia, Inc.Attorney Brian J. Janura added to party Growcentia, Inc.(pty:pla) (Janura, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/23/2020. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 12/4/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, with the Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/27/2020. All participants shall use the dial-in information as previously ordered. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines filed by Jemie B.V.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/23/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#19) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10 /23/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/23/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02619-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Growcentia, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Tamkin, Gregory) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Associated Deadlines by Defendant Jemie B.V.. (O'Donnell, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/20/2020. Pursuant to #6 Order, the Parties were to complete and file their Consent Form by yesterday, October 19, 2020. Having not received a completed Consent Form, the Parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a completed Consent Form by close of business today, October 20, 2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Jemie B.V.. Jemie B.V. answer due 11/5/2020. (O'Donnell, Brian) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin Michael Bell on behalf of Jemie B.V.Attorney Kevin Michael Bell added to party Jemie B.V.(pty:dft) (Bell, Kevin) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Patrick O'Donnell on behalf of Jemie B.V.Attorney Brian Patrick O'Donnell added to party Jemie B.V.(pty:dft) (O'Donnell, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Growcentia, Inc.. Jemie B.V. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Tamkin, Gregory) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/9/2020. Due to an unavoidable scheduling conflict, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 2:30 PM is hereby RESET in time only to 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/11/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 10/19/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/26/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/2/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint, Exhibit A to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Plaintiff Growcentia, Inc.. (Tamkin, Gregory) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Jemie B.V. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7460981)Attorney Gregory Scot Tamkin added to party Growcentia, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Growcentia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Tamkin, Gregory) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less