This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2019 at 07:55:42 (UTC).

Grow v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 Grow filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Transamerica Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William E. Cassady and Kristi K. DuBose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00630

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William E. Cassady

Presiding Judge

Kristi K. DuBose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hercilia H. Grow

Defendant

Transamerica Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Edward Vaughan

211 South Cedar Street

Mobile, AL 36602

John Grow, II

82 St. Michael St.

Mobile, AL 36602

Winston R. Grow

Attorney at Partridge, Smith, P.C.

3290 Dauphin Street, Ste 600

Mobile, AL 36606

Defendant Attorneys

Chris Burkhalter

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

11 North Water Street, Suite 22200

Mobile, AL 36602

Forrest S. Latta

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

P.O. Box 2287

Mobile, AL 36652

Taylor Barr Johnson

11 North Water St., Suite 22200

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Lance Cary)) (Latta, Forrest) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Grow, Winston) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

3 #15

Exhibit Exhibit 15

3 #14

Exhibit Exhibit 14

3 #13

Exhibit Exhibit 13

3 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 12

3 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 11

3 #10

Exhibit Exhibit 10

3 #9

Exhibit Exhibit 9

3 #8

Exhibit Exhibit 8

3 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 7

3 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

3 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

3 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

3 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hercilia H. Grow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15) (Grow, Winston) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order re: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hercilia H. Grow, #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Hercilia H. Grow, ( Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 02:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/30/3019. (eec) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #8 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Cassady. (nah) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Lance Cary)) (Latta, Forrest) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (nah) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Grow, Winston) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Barr Johnson on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Johnson, Taylor) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #3 Motion to Remand to State Court; taking under advisement #4 Motion to Supplement. Any response to these motions by the removing party shall be filed not later than October 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/16/19. (Cassady, William) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Supplement and Amend to Motion to Remand for An Award of Attorney's Fees Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (nah) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Supplement and Amend to Motion to Remand for An Award of Attorney's Fees filed by Hercilia H. Grow. (Grow, Winston) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (nah) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hercilia H. Grow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15) (Grow, Winston) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 09/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Transamerica Life Insurance Company from Mobile County Circuit Court, case number CV-2018-902419. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2474283, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (state court file), #2 Exhibit B (email), #3 Exhibit C (email), #4 Exhibit D (email), #5 Exhibit E (email), #6 Exhibit F (Walker depo), #7 Exhibit G (hrng tran), #8 Exhibit H (discovery resp)) (Latta, Forrest) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less