Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2020 at 07:55:56 (UTC).

Grover v. State of Nebraska

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Grover filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Nebraska. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pro Se Docket and Richard G. Kopf. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00546

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pro Se Docket

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Kopf

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joshua C. Grover

Wahoo, NE 68066

Defendant

State of Nebraska

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT - PRO SE - providing that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby notified that the filing of a notice of appeal will make him liable for payment of the full $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. This is because the Prison Litigation Reform Act requires an incarcerated civil appellant to pay the full amount of the $505.00 appellate filing fee by making monthly payments to the court, even if he or she is proceeding in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). By filing a notice of appeal, Plaintiff will be consenting to the deduction of the $505.00 filing fee from his prison account by prison officials. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant State of Nebraska Joshua C. Grover. (LAC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On the court's own motion, the court will give Plaintiff 30 days in which to file an Amended Complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted. Failure to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: "February 24, 2020: check for amended complaint." Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#9

(#9) SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Petitioner Joshua C. Grover. (LAC) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is ordered that: (1) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP #5 is granted. The filing fee shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(b)(2). Until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid, the prisoner shall be obligated to pay, and the agency having custody of the prisoner shall forward to the clerk of the court, 20 percent of the preceding month's income in such months as the account exceeds $10.00. (2) The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on the appropriate financial officer for Plaintiff's current institution. (3) The next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(KLL) Modified on 1/7/2020 to reflect copy mailed to plaintiff's institution (LKO). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Copy mailed to Saunders County Corrections. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Joshua C. Grover.(LAC) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER. It is ordered that: (1) Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. (2) The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 (Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit). (3) The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 13, 2020: Check for MIFP or payment. ***Set Pro Se Case Management Deadline for 1/13/2020.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy of this order and Form AO240 mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KLL) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State of Nebraska filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Joshua C. Grover. (LAC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JUDGMENT - PRO SE - providing that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby notified that the filing of a notice of appeal will make him liable for payment of the full $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. This is because the Prison Litigation Reform Act requires an incarcerated civil appellant to pay the full amount of the $505.00 appellate filing fee by making monthly payments to the court, even if he or she is proceeding in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). By filing a notice of appeal, Plaintiff will be consenting to the deduction of the $505.00 filing fee from his prison account by prison officials. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant State of Nebraska Joshua C. Grover. (LAC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On the court's own motion, the court will give Plaintiff 30 days in which to file an Amended Complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted. Failure to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: "February 24, 2020: check for amended complaint." Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Petitioner Joshua C. Grover. (LAC) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is ordered that: (1) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP #5 is granted. The filing fee shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(b)(2). Until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid, the prisoner shall be obligated to pay, and the agency having custody of the prisoner shall forward to the clerk of the court, 20 percent of the preceding month's income in such months as the account exceeds $10.00. (2) The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on the appropriate financial officer for Plaintiff's current institution. (3) The next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. sec. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(KLL) Modified on 1/7/2020 to reflect copy mailed to plaintiff's institution (LKO). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Joshua C. Grover. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LAC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Copy mailed to Saunders County Corrections. (LKO) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Joshua C. Grover.(LAC) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER. It is ordered that: (1) Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. (2) The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 (Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit). (3) The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 13, 2020: Check for MIFP or payment. ***Set Pro Se Case Management Deadline for 1/13/2020.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy of this order and Form AO240 mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KLL) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against State of Nebraska filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Joshua C. Grover. (LAC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less