This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2022 at 08:29:17 (UTC).

Grove et al v. Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Grove filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-04064

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Terry Grove

Sharon Grove

Connor Grove

Defendant

Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara E. Show

Attorney at Johnson, Janklow, Abdallah & Reiter, LLP

101 South Main Avenue, Suite 100, Po Box 2348

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-5933

Scott A. Abdallah

Attorney at Johnson, Janklow, Abdallah & Reiter, LLP

101 South Main Avenue, Suite 100, Po Box 2348

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-5933

Defendant Attorney

Eric C. Schulte

Attorney at Davenport, Evans, Hurwitz & Smith

Po Box 1030

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-1030

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3793468, in shell case on 05/17/2022 filed by Terry Grove, Sharon Grove, Connor Grove on 05/17/2022. (DLC) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. 1 Summons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(DLC) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

AO 85

#3

(#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company re: #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint . Acknowledgement filed by Terry Grove, Sharon Grove, Connor Grove. (Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Schulte, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on June 13, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(DLC) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

5 #1

Letter to Counsel

#6

(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Schulte, Eric) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#7

(#7) Discovery Report re #5 Order for Discovery Report by Connor Grove, Sharon Grove, Terry Grove. Related document: #5 Order for Discovery Report.(Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Discovery Report re #5 Order for Discovery Report by Connor Grove, Sharon Grove, Terry Grove. Related document: #5 Order for Discovery Report.(Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Schulte, Eric) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on June 13, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(DLC) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Schulte, Eric) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company re: #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint . Acknowledgement filed by Terry Grove, Sharon Grove, Connor Grove. (Abdallah, Scott) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Midwest Family Mutual Insurance Company. 1 Summons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(DLC) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3793468, in shell case on 05/17/2022 filed by Terry Grove, Sharon Grove, Connor Grove on 05/17/2022. (DLC) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less