This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 07:17:41 (UTC).

Grossman v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Grossman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David N. Hurd and Therese Wiley Dancks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David N. Hurd

Referral Judge

Therese Wiley Dancks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justine Grossman

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew A. Haicken

Attorney at Haicken Law PLLC

11 Broadway - Suite 615

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Target Corporation. (map) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference by Telephone set for 5/2/2022 at 9:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/25/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference by Telephone set for 5/2/2022 at 9:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/25/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Target Corporation. (map) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Target Corporation (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5776241) filed by Justine Grossman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Aaron Haicken