This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 16:23:22 (UTC).

Grisham v. Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Grisham filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00004

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kyle S. Grisham

Defendant

Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cynthia A. Wilson

Attorney at Madewell, Jared, Halfacre, Williams & Wilson

230 N Washington Avenue

Cookeville, TN 38501

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/27/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC.(Smith, Paul) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Stamelos on behalf of Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC (Stamelos, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

1 #2

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit - Notice of Right to Sue

#10

(#10) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Maxwell Smith, III on behalf of Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Kyle S. Grisham. Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC served on 1/29/2020. (Wilson, Cynthia) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC answer due 3/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/21/2020. (vh) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 3:30 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3071369), filed by Kyle S. Grisham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Mark E. Stamelos, Paul Maxwell Smith, III and Cynthia A. Wilson. (dt) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC.(Smith, Paul) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC answer due 3/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/21/2020. (vh) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Maxwell Smith, III on behalf of Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC (Smith, Paul) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Stamelos on behalf of Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC (Stamelos, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Kyle S. Grisham. Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC served on 1/29/2020. (Wilson, Cynthia) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 1/27/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 3:30 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Nyrstar Gordonsville LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3071369), filed by Kyle S. Grisham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less